Pro-Com Products, Inc. v. Kings Express LA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PRO-COM PRODUCTS, INC and Pro-Com Products, Inc.
Defendant: DENNIS MCCORMICK, an Individual, KING'S EXPRESS, INC., a California Corporation, JOHN VINCENT TARWATER, an individual, KING'S EXPRESS LA, INC, Kings Express, Inc., Kings Express Inc., Dennis McCormick, Does 1 through 25, inclusive and Infinity Logistics Inc
Petitioner: KING'S EXPRESS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity
3Rd Party Plaintiff: John Vincent Tarwater and Kings Express LA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06035
Filed: July 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Amended Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Infinity Logistics, Inc. #83 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. The Amended Request for Entry of Default is made as to Defendant "Infinity Logistics, Inc." The proof of service on the First Amended Complaint was made as to, "Infinity Logistics, Inc., a California corporation." The First Amended Complaint names defendant as, "Infinity Logistics, Inc., a suspended California Corporation, d/b/a King's Express, Inc." Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 83 Second REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Infinity Logistics Inc filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 Defendants Kings LA, Inc. and John Tarwater's Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants, Crossclaim Plaintiffs, and Third Party Plaintiffs Kings Express LA, Inc..(Rivin, Ira)
April 1, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Infinity Logistics, Inc. #80 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. The Request for Entry of Default is made as to Defendant Infinity Logistics, Inc. The Complaint names defendant as, "Infinity Logistics, Inc., a suspended California Corporation, d/b/a King's Express, Inc." The declaration accompanying the Request indicates that the party was served with the summons and complaint via the court's electronic notice. The NEF was not served upon defendant via CM/ECF, as an appearance was made after those filings. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 80 First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Infinity Logistics Inc filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Park, James)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION STRIKE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 2/27/2019, Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc. filed a Motion to Strike Defendant Infinity Logistics, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint and Request for Default, and noticed a hearing for 4/12/2019 at 9:30 AM ("MTS") #76 . Infinity Logistics has not filed an Opposition to the MTS, and the 3/22/2019 deadline for doing so has passed. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's MTS and VACATES the 4/12/2019 hearing. Infinity Logistics' Answer #71 and Notice of Interested Parties #72 are hereby STRICKEN. Since Plaintiff has not followed the correct procedure for requesting an entry of default, however, the Court DENIES that portion of its MTS without prejudice to Plaintiff properly requesting that the Clerk enter default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55 and Local Rule 55. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Answer of Infinity Logistics, Inc. a suspended Corporation Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #72 #76 , Non-Opposition to Motion, #77 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Park, James)
March 26, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Answer of Infinity Logistics, Inc. a suspended Corporation Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #72 #76 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 76 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Answer of Infinity Logistics, Inc. a suspended Corporation Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #72 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James Park in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice) (Park, James)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #53 and GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #69 . To the extent that McCormick's first and only affirmative defense can even be construed as an "affirmative defense," it is hereby STRICKEN in its entirety from his Answer due to lack of opposition. The 2/22/2019 hearing on the Motion to Strike is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Change of address by James H. Park attorney for Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 1250 Bixby Drive, City of Industry, CA 91745. Filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 73 Answer to Cross-Claim and ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, filed by Cross-Defendant Kings Express Inc..(Attorney Gregg S Garfinkel added to party Kings Express Inc.(pty:3pd))(Garfinkel, Gregg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Infinity Logistics Inc, Kings Express Inc., (Garfinkel, Gregg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 filed by Defendants Infinity Logistics Inc, Kings Express Inc..(Attorney Gregg S Garfinkel added to party Infinity Logistics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg S Garfinkel added to party Kings Express Inc.(pty:dft))(Garfinkel, Gregg)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Cory Salisbury for Defendant Dennis McCormick in place of Attorney Miles L. Kavaller #68 . (gk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendant Dennis Mccormick's First Affirmative Defense Order,, #63 , Answer to Complaint #52 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of James Park in support MTS) (Park, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 68 APPLICATION of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant Dennis McCormick, Dennis McCormick. Application set for hearing on 2/8/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant and Cross-Defendsant Dennis McCormick and Substitute Attorney Cory Saliusbury) (Kavaller, Miles)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/31/2019 (early mediation); 3/10/2020. Joint status report re settlement due by 8/7/2019 (joint report re results of early mediation); 3/17/2020. (gk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7-31-19 (early mediation); 3-10-20. Joint status report re settlement due by: 8-7-19 (joint report re results of early mediation): 3-17-20. (shb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants Kings Express LA, Inc. and John Tarwater's Motion to Dismiss Fifteenth Through Nineteenth Claims for Relief Alleged in First Amended Complaint #53 presently scheduled for hearing on January 4, 2019, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. Further, the scheduling conference on January 4, 2019 is also VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF, PRO-COM PRODUCTS, INC. AND DEFENDANT DENNIS MCCORMICK TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE MCCORMICK'S ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #60 , the Court orders that the time within which Plaintiff, Pro-Com Pro Products, Inc. may file a motion to strike the Answer of Dennis McCormick to the First Amended Complaint may be extended to ten days after the Court rules on the Defendants Kings Express-LA, Inc. and John Tarwater Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, currently scheduled for hearing on 1/4/2019. (gk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 62 REPLY Brief Of Defendants Kings Express La, Inc. And John Vincent Tarwater In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Claims In First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kings Express LA, Inc., John Vincent Tarwater. (Rivin, Ira)
December 21, 2018 Filing 61 JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT REPORT of PURSUANT TO RULE 26f filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
December 18, 2018 Filing 60 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant Dennis McCormick to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time of Plaintiff, Pro-Com Products, Inc. to File Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant Dennis McCormick to First Amended Complaint)(Kavaller, Miles)
December 14, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion #58 , Response in Opposition to Motion #57 (Park, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 58 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifteenth through Nineteenth Claims for Relief Alleged in First Amended Complaint #53 Corrected Format (10 pages) filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 57 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifteenth through Nineteenth Claims for Relief Alleged in First Amended Complaint #53 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
December 12, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to Crossclaim, Third Party Complaint, filed by Crossclaim and Third Party Dennis McCormick.(Kavaller, Miles)
December 7, 2018 Filing 55 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/21/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
December 7, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifteenth through Nineteenth Claims for Relief Alleged in First Amended Complaint #53 (Rivin, Ira)
December 3, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifteenth through Nineteenth Claims for Relief Alleged in First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Kings Express LA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Rivin, Ira)
December 3, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick.(Kavaller, Miles)
November 21, 2018 Filing 51 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #44 as to Defendant King's Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation. (gk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 50 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #44 as to Defendant Infinity Logistics, Inc. d/b/a King's Express, Inc. (gk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 49 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #46 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #47 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 48 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #45 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #47 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #44 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The phrase "et. al," should not be used on the Summons form. Below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," please indicate, " ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
November 12, 2018 Filing 46 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 45 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 44 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), Crossclaim, Third Party Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, BOL and Docs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CV-71)(Park, James)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER Re Motion to Remand #16 ; Motion to Strike Amended Notice of Removal #18 ; Motion to Dismiss #19 ; Motion to Withdraw, Quash Service of Process, and Substitute Party #20 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the foregoing, the Court: (1) DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; (2) DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Amended Notice of Removal; (3) DENIES Kavaller's and McCormick's Motion to Quash Service; (4) DENIES Kavaller's and McCormick's Motion to Substitute Parties; (5) GRANTS Kavaller's Motion to Withdraw; (6) GRANTS McCormick's Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend within 21 days of the date of this Order; and (7) Defendants shall file their response within 21 days after Plaintiff has filed its amended complaint. (jp)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and to Stay Action Pending Remand #16 , Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Amended Notice of Removal and Notice to Withdraw as Counsel #18 , Defendant Dennis McCormick' Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim #19 , and Miles L. Kavaller, Esq. and/or Dennis McCormick' Motion To: 1. Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California Corporation, 2. Quash Service of Process on Defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California Corporation Nunc Pro Tunc; and 3. Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation in Lieu of Defendant Kings Express, Inc., an Unknown Business Entity #20 presently scheduled for hearing on September 7, 2018, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 24, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
August 23, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY in support of motion to strike First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Amended Notice of Removal Amended Document (Non-Motion) #11 #18 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY in support of motion to remand First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse Central District #10 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney ; Quash Service of Process on defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California corporation and Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation in lieu of Kings Express, In #20 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF RULE 26 AND RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND APPLICABLE DEADLINES #32 #35 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Accordingly, the September 7, 2018 Scheduling Conference is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, after the pending motions have been resolved. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
August 21, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 34 (Park, James)
August 21, 2018 Filing 35 First STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 and 16 Conference from September 7, 2018 to TBD by Court after hearing on September 7, 2018 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 34 , Stipulation to Continue,, Stipulation to Stay Case, #32 , First STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Motion to Remand filed by plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Park, James)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4, the parties shall lodged a proposed order to the Stipulation to Continue Rule 26 and Rule 16 Conference and Applicable Deadlines #32 forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2018 Filing 33 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Third-Party Complaint NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc., upon Third-Party Defendant Kings Express, Inc. (a California Corporation ) acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Miles Kaveller, Attorney for Kings Express, Inc.. (Rivin, Ira)
August 20, 2018 Filing 32 First STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 and Rule 16 Conference from 09/07/2018 to TBD by Judge after hearing Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #15 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , First STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc..(Park, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney ; Quash Service of Process on defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California corporation and Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation in lieu of Kings Express, In #20 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 29 21-Day Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #21 as to Third Party Defendant Kings Express, Inc. (gk)
August 9, 2018 Filing 28 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc., identifying Pro-Com Products, Inc.. (Park, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Central District #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 8, 2018 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Amended Notice of Removal Amended Document (Non-Motion) #11 #18 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
August 7, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Central District #16 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
August 7, 2018 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Dennis McCormick in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney ; Quash Service of Process on defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California corporation and Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation in lieu of Kings Express, In #20 filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
August 6, 2018 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendant Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation; with Jury Demand filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Kings Express LA, Inc. and John Vincent Tarwater. (Answer, Crossclaim, and Third Party Complaint filed as one document. See document number 21) (gk)
August 6, 2018 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) CROSSCLAIM against Crossdefendant Dennis McCormick; with Jury Demand filed by Defendants and Crossclaimants Kings Express LA, Inc. and John Vincent Tarwater. (Answer, Crossclaim, and Third Party Complaint filed as one document. See document number 21) (gk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 23 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc., (Rivin, Ira)
August 6, 2018 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #21 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc.. (Rivin, Ira)
August 6, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND Amended Answer, Crossclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc..(Rivin, Ira)
August 6, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Miles L. Kavaller to Withdraw as Attorney ; Quash Service of Process on defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California corporation and Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation in lieu of Kings Express, Inc., an Unknown Business Entity.) filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. Motion set for hearing on 9/7/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to be Relieved as Attorney of Record for Defendant Kings Express, Inc., a Califonia corporation; Quash Service of Process on defendant Kings Express, Inc., a California corporation and Substitute Kings Express, Inc., a Minnesota corporation in lieu of Kings Express, Inc., an Unknown Business Entity.) (Kavaller, Miles)
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. Motion set for hearing on 9/7/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum iso Motion to Dismiss) (Kavaller, Miles)
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Amended Notice of Removal Amended Document (Non-Motion) #11 filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/7/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James Park in support of MTS amended NOR) (Park, James)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and to Stay Action Pending Remand #16 from August 31, 2018 to September 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2018 Filing 16 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Central District filed by Plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2018 at 09:03 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Remand) (Park, James)
July 24, 2018 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2018 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 7/19/2018, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Remand and to Stay Pending Remand #10 . Plaintiff set the hearing for 8/10/2018 at 9:30 AM. Under this District's Local Rules, oral motions must be filed at least 28 or 31 days in advance of the noticed hearing date, depending on the form of service. The 8/10/2018 hearing date violates this Local Rule. Due to Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Local Rules, the Court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff may refile and serve upon Defendants a rules-compliant motion within 14 days of this Order. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Answer of Kings Express LA, Inc. and John Vincent Tarwater to Complaint filed by Defendants Kings Express LA, Inc..(Rivin, Ira)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Ira G. Rivin for Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc. in place of Attorney Miles L. Kavaller #9 . (gk)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Dennis McCormick. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Amended Notice of Removal (Kavaller, Miles)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse Central District filed by Plaintff Pro-Com Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/10/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. James Park in support of remand, #2 Exhibit Decl. James Park Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Decl. James Park "B") (Park, James)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Ira G. Rivin in place of attorney Miles L. Kavaller filed by Defendant Kings Express LA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Ira G Rivin added to party Kings Express LA, Inc. (pty:dft)) (Rivin, Ira)
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Miles L. Kavaller re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 re: Proof of Service filed by Defendants Kings Express LA, Inc., Kings Express, Inc., Kings Express, Inc., Dennis McCormick. (Kavaller, Miles)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
July 11, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Kings Express LA, Inc., Kings Express, Inc. (a California Corporation ), Kings Express, Inc. (an Unknown Business Entity ), Dennis McCormick, John Vincent Tarwater. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Pro-Com Products, Inc. Filed in State Court on 1/25/18 Submitted with the Notice of Removal #1 . (car)
July 11, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DENNIS MCCORMICK, an Individual, KING'S EXPRESS LA, INC, KING'S EXPRESS, INC., a California Corporation, Movant KING'S EXPRESS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity. (Kavaller, Miles)
July 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, (Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party JOHN VINCENT TARWATER, an individual(pty:dft))(Kavaller, Miles)
July 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Supertior Court, case number BC710498 Receipt No: 0973-22073334 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants KING'S EXPRESS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity, KING'S EXPRESS, INC., a California Corporation, KING'S EXPRESS LA, INC, DENNIS MCCORMICK, an Individual. (Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party DENNIS MCCORMICK, an Individual(pty:dft), Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party KING'S EXPRESS LA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party KING'S EXPRESS, INC., a California Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party KING'S EXPRESS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity(pty:bkmov))(Kavaller, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pro-Com Products, Inc. v. Kings Express LA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KING'S EXPRESS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS MCCORMICK, an Individual
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING'S EXPRESS, INC., a California Corporation
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN VINCENT TARWATER, an individual
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING'S EXPRESS LA, INC
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Express, Inc.
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Express Inc.
Represented By: Gregg S Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCormick
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Represented By: Cory T Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Logistics Inc
Represented By: Gregg S Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRO-COM PRODUCTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro-Com Products, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Park
Represented By: James H Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John Vincent Tarwater
Represented By: Ira G Rivin
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Kings Express LA, Inc.
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Represented By: Ira G Rivin
Represented By: Danielle Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?