Westlake Coach Company, LLC v. Maserati North America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Westlake Coach Company, LLC
Defendant: Maserati North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06098
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC709796, acknowledged on 8/14/2018. (iv)
August 9, 2018 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court,County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court,County of Los Angeles. (yl)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON STIPULATION #21 TO REMAND CASE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, re Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #21 . The Court has reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation to Remand Action to State Court and, good cause appearing therefor, hereby orders as follows:1. The parties' stipulation is GRANTED. This action, with the case number 2:18-cv-06098 in the United StatesDistrict Court for the Central District of California, is hereby remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court Case number BC709796 Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (yl)
August 6, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanchez, Maurice)
August 1, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa Marie Gibson counsel for Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. Lisa Marie Gibson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 30, 2018 Filing 19 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Westlake Coach Company, LLC.. (Broccolo, Frank)
July 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Westlake Coach Company, LLC, identifying Westlake Coach Company, LLC and Maserati North America, Inc.. (Broccolo, Frank)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 27, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Blake A. Gansborg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maserati North America, Inc., designating Crispin Collin as local counsel. (lom)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Mark T Clouatre APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maserati North America, Inc., designating Crispin Collin as local counsel. (lom)
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc..(Collins, Crispin)
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Maserati North America, Inc., re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blake A. Gansborg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Maserati North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22122230) #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark T. Clouatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Maserati North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22122560) #11 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 served on 07/20/2018. (Collins, Crispin)
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark T. Clouatre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Maserati North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22122560) filed by defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collins, Crispin)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blake A. Gansborg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Maserati North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22122230) filed by defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collins, Crispin)
July 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blake Gansborg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark T. Clouatre. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on July 13, 2018. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc., (Gibson, Lisa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC709796 Receipt No: 0973-22086528 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Maserati North America, Inc.. (Attorney Lisa Marie Gibson added to party Maserati North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gibson, Lisa)
July 13, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Maserati North America, Inc. Does 1 through 100, inclusive, filed by plaintiff Westlake Coach Company, LLC. (Filed in state court 6/12/18, submitted as document 1, p. 9) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westlake Coach Company, LLC v. Maserati North America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maserati North America, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice Sanchez
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gibson
Represented By: Crispin Labayan Collins
Represented By: Mark T Clouatre
Represented By: Blake Gansborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlake Coach Company, LLC
Represented By: Frank John Broccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?