MGM Resorts International, et al v. Quintivia Abner, et al

Plaintiff: MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC and MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC
Defendant: REYNITA BANABAN, DAVID FLOEN, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, BRENDA ARCE, CYNTHIA AGOSTA, SHARVONNE FOLMAR, LAQUANA BROWN, KEYATRA GRANT, KENDAL S. BALAS, JOE ADKINS, TAYLOR L. HILL, MATTHEW CADY, ALBERT YSA, BABU BHUIYAN, JON C. GURULE, MICHAEL DELCID, BRITTANY GOOD, SHANECA GOLDMAN, JOSEPH AGOSTA III, MYRON DYE, KERI JAMES, MICHELLE BRIMHALL, GARY HIGHTOWER, CHERIE JEAN ADAMS, RANDALL CHRISTENSEN, FARRAH ANGELIC, ZERONDRICK HUBBARD, ZELDA ADAME, SHANNA CAPUTO, DUANE DUBBS, III, COURTLAND BIBBS, TARA BURFIELD, LORENA ESQUIBEL, JERRALYNN HICKS, HUNTER CALEF, CHRISTY R. GARZA, NAMARI JANUARY, JESSICA EDMONDSON, STEVE HOFFMASTER, ALBERT HIGGINS, Sr., ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr., BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER, NORMA GARCIA-FELIX, DAMON GIPSON, CRAIG FINE, FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS, JAZELLE FRELO, DONNA JEAN ADCOCK, CHERI LYNN HOWARD, MINDY BITRICH, ALEXIS CADY, ABNER QUINTIVIA, PEARLINA CARTER, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, LISA BOISSIERE-WRIGHT, FRANK L. HAMMERSLEY, APRIL L. HAGEN, CATHY BAROUIST, NIKITA HARRIS, MARK BAQUEDANO, KELIAH FELL, LA STAR EDWARDS, JANICEY BRAR, LACEY BARTKO, ROY EUWING, INESSA GALAGAN, DEBORAH HIGGINS, DANETTE COLASIN, MARGRETTA GRAHAM, LISA DIRADO-MORENO, KAYLA BOWEN, JEREMY SCOTT HICKS, DAVID FLUKER, TAMMY LYNN HAYDEN, KIMBERLY A. DOWNES, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, DERRICK GAGLIARDI, KRISTINE ARUTUNYAN, AFRICA ALLEN, WENDY BALDWIN, TERRANCE BANKS, ROSEMARY GARCIA, KHALFANI HOWARD, ROSIE AMATULLI, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, APRIL HOPWOOD, PAMELA GOMEZ, FELICITY CLARK, SUMOYYAH IRVING, NITISHA FERGUSON, Mark Anthony Austin,, Sr., MACEY N. BALAS, TERESA DELEON HILL, JOSHUA BITRICH, TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA, EDWINNA BRAME, DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr., JAMES MICHAEL GARLAND, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, MELANIE LEANNE FISH, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, CONSTANTINO CERRANO, BRANDY HARMON, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, OLEG GALAGAN, KELLY JO HIEBERT, STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr., EVAN FEINBERG, SETH BARKER, GLENN J. DORMER, MYESHA HOWARD, CECILIA GALLEGOS, LETICIA CANNON, SYLVIA LYNN BROOKS, HIRAM HAIRSTONE, JOHNATHAN DUNDEE HUTCHINSON, SIERRA M. DONNELLY, TIFFANY CHARAN, ALIYAH HOWARD, KIRK BRIMHALL, VERNELL GIBSON, JAVIER ALEMAN, LISA FINE, CLARO DUQUE, JASMINE BELL, IYANA GAINES, TERRENCE BIRDEN, DANIEL CHLEBOWSKI, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, SWATAVIA BOWLES, KENDALL HOBBS, TREVOR ANTHONY GARZA, ASHLIE GUERRERO, MAVIS BARNETTE, AMY HARRICK, DAVID BLASHAW, PATRESE DAVIS, HAILEY DEQUILLETTES, NANCY L. FEYMA, BANGMA MARTIN, JEFFREY R. HOLDEN, SHAMINA CARPENTER, MELISSA ARROYO, DEBBIE ANN DURAN-GOMEZ, BOLDEN FRANCHELLE, Nelisha Richard, Courtney Lowe, Daniel Paiz, Michael Sambrano, Amoreya Rollins, Jeff Sandwell, Joe M. Quinteros, David Norman, Kimberly Ann Smith, Darline Varnsladson, Gregory L. Manis, Vanessa Mallory, Jason McMillian, Jim Plummer, Shauntay Taylor, Kaitlin Manahan, Daisy Madrigal, Brenda Topete, Alala Reed, Lori Anne McElroy, Philip Loncar, Amanda Vandecar, YSA ALBERT, Morgan B. Virus, Tanya McClain, Amber Van Voorhis, Jito Scales, Rita Mims, Tiffany McCellan, Kathleen Jo Peterson, Erenia Mijangos, Stella Walz, VIVEK JAYARAMAN, Melinda Stilwell, MYKENZIE KE'ALOHILANI, Eric J. Regnier, Edward Trovato, Christiann Meyer, Britney Salas, Ricardo Lopez, Courtney Nicole Winters, Sandra Venables, Suelema Ramos, Masoud Pazouki, Deneica Watkins, Pamela A. Lekavich, Damien McIntyre, Shelonda Rhodes, Coryne Lippert, Steven Resnick, MARTIN BANGMA, Zaqoia Marshall, Daniel Luckadue, Wendy Lynn Lazio, Antoinette Moore, Zahra Watkins, Reylene D. Soto, Cindy Vandyke, Dorothy Sigala, Margaret Ventresca, Sandy Tatelman, Alice Ware, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Graciela Rebollar, Andra C. Williams, Troy O. Zeeman, Lexi Ann McIntosh, Jerry J. Speraw, Hannah Logan, Jaja Triplett, Holly E. Santino, Joshaway Stevens, Anthony Thomas McBride, Megan S. Meredith, Amir Shaterian, Collearen Randolph, Amelia B. Morales, Kyle D. Taylor, Grace Nicassio, Charles V. Wynn, Anne B. Krieghoff, Christina Melgoza, Patricia Murrillo, Rosemary Phillips, Michael McClain, Shannon Lynn Rimmer, Robin McCormick, Felisha Roman, Bryan Matthews, Louella Abad Parga, Kelly Yeakel, Anthony Mayshack, Debra Reliford, Joel Twycross, Peejman Shadalo, Laurie L. Manis, Gaila Requena, Heather Chiyeko Miyakawa, Rudolph Roquemore, MARK ANTHONY AUSTIN, SR, Jacob Stoddard, Brent Gregory Little, Lilianna Molina, SAMMIESHA JOHNSON, Summer Neria, Rhasaan Simmons, Mioshi Wallace, Valarie Lofton, HIRAM HAIRSTON, Ebony Sholes, Courtney N. Mayo, Roberta B. Newton, Leticia Marie Staggs, TABIA J. JOHNSON, Raekwon Smith, Laterrius D. Peters, Michael Ogazon, Jasmine Waddles, Darralyn Thompson, Jathan Matthews, DAVE FLOEN, Tankia Matthews, Linda Nooner, Aaron Zackery, Ryan Thomas Schoenborn, Lekecia Turner, Levelle Rivers, Erica Susan Poppen, Terrie Pettway, Albernisha Thomas, Greg Loring, Erik Zaluske, Emily Ann Trematerra, Zabrina Wilson, Ila Oldham, Venetia White, James Lee Skinner, Jr., Michelle N. Little, Edwin Lanier, Michael Thomas Reichard, Connie Manning, Gerard Washack, Kimberly Macarthur, Lori A. Young, QUINTIVIA ABNER, Artrice Turner, Leotis Tramble, Taylor Winston, Dolores M. Solano, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Nanita Williams, Tiffani Okum, Traivona Stapleton, Isaac Xavier Orozco, Joann Stoudemire, Jaycee V. Ringle, Wilfredo Maquindang, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, Shauna McKenzie, Nedal Salman, Tristina Richards, John Anthony Perico, Riley S. Murray, Krystal K. Nash, GRACE KAJIMURA, Jose Uriarte, Rachel Roach, BRENDA C. KIMBER, Sundae McDowell, William Shearer, Sadat Merriwether, Bradley Resnick, Elizabeth McNeil, Austin Marcus, FRANCHELLE BOLDEN, Eric J. Nobriga Sr., Coral Nettles, Demetrius Trammel, Vorn Seal Radcliffe, Myra Randle, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Kishawna Scott, Holly L. Mayes, Brooke Magorien, Joshua Lorenzo Perez, Evelyne Annette Morris, Abraham Tanielian, Israel Samuel Villalobos, Ashley Nicole Mireles, Dustin Mascaro, Mariama Amina Walker, Sandra Villalba, Juanita Toliver, Montee White, Morgan Moeller, LEVITICUS E. JOHNSON, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, Quentin Waller, Kimberly Payton, Theresa Mayshack, Todd Sudakoff, Brandi Williams and Christopher Alan Marsh
Case Number: 2:2018cv06197
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 (IN CHAMBERS) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENTATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (DKT. #232 , #233 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Robert M. Adams and Robert T. Eglet each filed an application to appear pro hac vice (Dkt. 232, 233) (the "Applications"). The Applications failed to meet the requirements of L.R. 83-2.1.3.3. On December 26,2018, a Deficiency was issued informing counsel of the discrepancies. Dkt. 234. The Court provided counsel an opportunity to refile the Applications consistent with the Local Rule. The December 27, 2018 Order gave counsel until January 3, 2018 to refile the Applications. Dkt. 235. The Applications have not been refiled. Accordingly, the Applications are DENIED. The Clerk shall return the fee back to counsel and terminate Adams and Eglet from the docket. (bp)
January 3, 2019 Filing 236 STATUS REPORT ON MEDIATION filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Beecher, Jeremy)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE APPLICATIONS OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE (DKT. #232 #233 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Applications are denied without prejudice to them being refiled by January 3, 2019. The amended applications shall attach a proposed order (G-64 Order) and certificates of good standing that have been issued within 30 days prior to the filing of the applications. If an amended application(s) is not filed, the Clerk shall return the fee to counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 26, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, BABU BHUIYAN, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN #233 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): Application of Non-Resident Attorney has been previously updated. See court's website for updated form. (lom) Modified on 12/26/2018 (lom). (cc to R. Adams)
December 21, 2018 Filing 233 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, BABU BHUIYAN, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, JERRALYNN HICKS, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Deneica Watkins, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22939505) filed by Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, BABU BHUIYAN, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, JERRALYNN HICKS, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Deneica Watkins, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston. (Boyle, Kevin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 232 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert T. Eglet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, JERRALYNN HICKS, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Deneica Watkins, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22930786) filed by Plaintiff ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, JERRALYNN HICKS, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Deneica Watkins, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston. Application set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Boyle, Kevin)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Re Stipulation Regarding Stay Pending Mediation(DKT. #230 )by Judge John A. Kronstadt that The Stipulation is GRANTED. All proceedings in this action shall be stayed pending mediation. Accordingly, the hearing currently set for 1/28/2019, regarding defendants Motions #217 , #218 and Scheduling Conference are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance by counsel is necessary. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS (jp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 230 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Plaintiff MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation Regarding Stay Pending Mediation)(Kristovich, Bethany)
October 25, 2018 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Judith Mae All re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Keyatra Grant filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Tyler Robin Rupiper re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Jasmine Bell filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 227 DECLARATION of Ashley Silva re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Nelisha Richard filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 226 DECLARATION of David Ingram re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Nelisha Richard filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 225 DECLARATION of David Ingram re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Artrice Turner filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 224 DECLARATION of Ashley Silva re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Artrice Turner filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 223 DECLARATION of Jackie R. Brazeal re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Brent Little filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Brandon Allison re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Alala Reed filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 221 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Myesha Howard filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 220 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Nevada #218 filed by Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, BABU BHUIYAN, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Isaac Xavier Orozco, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston. (Boyle, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 219 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #217 filed by Defendants ZELDA ADAME, CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS, LACEY BARTKO, BABU BHUIYAN, COURTLAND BIBBS, TERRENCE BIRDEN, MINDY BITRICH, EDWINNA BRAME, TARA BURFIELD, KELVIN H. COACHMAN, DANETTE COLASIN, ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM, JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL, KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA, ROY EUWING, LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK, IYANA GAINES, OLEG GALAGAN, ROSEMARY GARCIA, DAMON GIPSON, BRITTANY GOOD, JENNIFER GRIMSHAW, JERRALYNN HICKS, APRIL HOPWOOD, TABIA J. JOHNSON, NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER, GRACE KAJIMURA, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, ASMIK KOTOYAN, Edwin Lanier, Valarie Lofton, Greg Loring, Kaitlin Manahan, Holly L. Mayes, Anthony Mayshack, Theresa Mayshack, Lori Anne McElroy, Erenia Mijangos, Morgan Moeller, Amelia B. Morales, Coral Nettles, Linda Nooner, Isaac Xavier Orozco, Kimberly Payton, Leonel M. Plata Jr., Rachel Roach, Dorothy Sigala, Kimberly Ann Smith, Dolores M. Solano, Leticia Marie Staggs, Melinda Stilwell, Brenda Topete, Emily Ann Trematerra, Edward Trovato, Sandra Valenzuela-Norris, Deneica Watkins, Montee White, Venetia White, Taylor Winston. (Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ZELDA ADAME(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ZELDA ADAME(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party LACEY BARTKO(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party LACEY BARTKO(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party BABU BHUIYAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party BABU BHUIYAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party COURTLAND BIBBS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party COURTLAND BIBBS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TERRENCE BIRDEN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TERRENCE BIRDEN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party MINDY BITRICH(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party MINDY BITRICH(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party EDWINNA BRAME(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party EDWINNA BRAME(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TARA BURFIELD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TARA BURFIELD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party KELVIN H. COACHMAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party KELVIN H. COACHMAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DANETTE COLASIN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DANETTE COLASIN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ROY EUWING(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ROY EUWING(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party IYANA GAINES(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party IYANA GAINES(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party OLEG GALAGAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party OLEG GALAGAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ROSEMARY GARCIA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ROSEMARY GARCIA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DAMON GIPSON(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DAMON GIPSON(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party BRITTANY GOOD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party BRITTANY GOOD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JENNIFER GRIMSHAW(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JENNIFER GRIMSHAW(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JERRALYNN HICKS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party JERRALYNN HICKS(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party APRIL HOPWOOD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party APRIL HOPWOOD(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TABIA J. JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party TABIA J. JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party GRACE KAJIMURA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party GRACE KAJIMURA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DANIEL D. KNIGHT(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party DANIEL D. KNIGHT(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ASMIK KOTOYAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party ASMIK KOTOYAN(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Edwin Lanier(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Edwin Lanier(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Valarie Lofton(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Valarie Lofton(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Greg Loring(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Greg Loring(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kaitlin Manahan(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kaitlin Manahan(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Holly L. Mayes(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Holly L. Mayes(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Anthony Mayshack(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Anthony Mayshack(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Theresa Mayshack(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Theresa Mayshack(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Lori Anne McElroy(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Lori Anne McElroy(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Erenia Mijangos(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Erenia Mijangos(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Morgan Moeller(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Morgan Moeller(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Amelia B. Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Amelia B. Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Coral Nettles(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Coral Nettles(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Linda Nooner(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Linda Nooner(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Isaac Xavier Orozco(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Isaac Xavier Orozco(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kimberly Payton(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kimberly Payton(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Leonel M. Plata Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Leonel M. Plata Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Rachel Roach(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Rachel Roach(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Dorothy Sigala(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Dorothy Sigala(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kimberly Ann Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Kimberly Ann Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Dolores M. Solano(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Dolores M. Solano(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Leticia Marie Staggs(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Leticia Marie Staggs(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Melinda Stilwell(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Melinda Stilwell(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Brenda Topete(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Brenda Topete(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Emily Ann Trematerra(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Emily Ann Trematerra(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Edward Trovato(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Edward Trovato(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Sandra Valenzuela-Norris(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Sandra Valenzuela-Norris(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Deneica Watkins(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Deneica Watkins(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Montee White(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Montee White(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Venetia White(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Venetia White(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Taylor Winston(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Richard Boyle added to party Taylor Winston(pty:dft))(Boyle, Kevin)
October 23, 2018 Filing 218 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the District of Nevada filed by Defendants DONNA JEAN ADCOCK, ROSIE AMATULLI, BRENDA ARCE, REYNITA BANABAN, TERRENCE BIRDEN, STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr, FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS, TERESA DELEON HILL, LISA DIRADO-MORENO, GLENN J. DORMER, KIMBERLY A. DOWNES, TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA, PAMELA GOMEZ, DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr, JON C. GURULE, AMY HARRICK, KELLY JO HIEBERT, ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr, DEBORAH HIGGINS, BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER, ALIYAH HOWARD, VIVEK JAYARAMAN, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, Anne B. Krieghoff, Wendy Lynn Lazio, Brooke Magorien, Gregory L. Manis, Laurie L. Manis, Bryan Matthews, Courtney N. Mayo, Anthony Thomas McBride, Tiffany McCellan, Shauna McKenzie, Elizabeth McNeil, Megan S. Meredith, Riley S. Murray, Krystal K. Nash, Grace Nicassio, Eric J. Nobriga Sr., Daniel Paiz, Joe M. Quinteros, Debra Reliford, Tristina Richards, Shannon Lynn Rimmer, Jeff Sandwell, Holly E. Santino, Reylene D. Soto, Traivona Stapleton, Sandy Tatelman, Amber Van Voorhis, Cindy Vandyke, Sandra Venables, Sandra Villalba, Israel Samuel Villalobos, Stella Walz, Courtney Nicole Winters, Kelly Yeakel, Erik Zaluske, Troy O. Zeeman. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Robinson in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (Robinson, Daniel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants DONNA JEAN ADCOCK, ROSIE AMATULLI, BRENDA ARCE, REYNITA BANABAN, TERRENCE BIRDEN, STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr, FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS, TERESA DELEON HILL, LISA DIRADO-MORENO, GLENN J. DORMER, KIMBERLY A. DOWNES, TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA, PAMELA GOMEZ, DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr, JON C. GURULE, AMY HARRICK, KELLY JO HIEBERT, ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr, DEBORAH HIGGINS, BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER, ALIYAH HOWARD, VIVEK JAYARAMAN, DANIEL D. KNIGHT, Anne B. Krieghoff, Wendy Lynn Lazio, Brooke Magorien, Gregory L. Manis, Laurie L. Manis, Bryan Matthews, Courtney N. Mayo, Anthony Thomas McBride, Tiffany McCellan, Shauna McKenzie, Elizabeth McNeil, Megan S. Meredith, Riley S. Murray, Krystal K. Nash, Grace Nicassio, Eric J. Nobriga Sr., Daniel Paiz, Joe M. Quinteros, Debra Reliford, Tristina Richards, Shannon Lynn Rimmer, Jeff Sandwell, Holly E. Santino, Reylene D. Soto, Traivona Stapleton, Sandy Tatelman, Amber Van Voorhis, Cindy Vandyke, Sandra Venables, Sandra Villalba, Israel Samuel Villalobos, Stella Walz, Courtney Nicole Winters, Kelly Yeakel, Erik Zaluske, Troy O. Zeeman. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DONNA JEAN ADCOCK(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DONNA JEAN ADCOCK(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ROSIE AMATULLI(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ROSIE AMATULLI(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party BRENDA ARCE(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party BRENDA ARCE(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party REYNITA BANABAN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party REYNITA BANABAN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TERRENCE BIRDEN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TERRENCE BIRDEN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TERESA DELEON HILL(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TERESA DELEON HILL(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party LISA DIRADO-MORENO(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party LISA DIRADO-MORENO(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party GLENN J. DORMER(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party GLENN J. DORMER(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party KIMBERLY A. DOWNES(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party KIMBERLY A. DOWNES(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party PAMELA GOMEZ(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party PAMELA GOMEZ(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party JON C. GURULE(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party JON C. GURULE(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party AMY HARRICK(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party AMY HARRICK(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party KELLY JO HIEBERT(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party KELLY JO HIEBERT(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DEBORAH HIGGINS(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DEBORAH HIGGINS(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ALIYAH HOWARD(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party ALIYAH HOWARD(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party VIVEK JAYARAMAN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party VIVEK JAYARAMAN(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DANIEL D. KNIGHT(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party DANIEL D. KNIGHT(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Anne B. Krieghoff(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Anne B. Krieghoff(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Wendy Lynn Lazio(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Wendy Lynn Lazio(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Brooke Magorien(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Brooke Magorien(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Gregory L. Manis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Gregory L. Manis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Laurie L. Manis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Laurie L. Manis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Bryan Matthews(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Bryan Matthews(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Courtney N. Mayo(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Courtney N. Mayo(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Anthony Thomas McBride(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Anthony Thomas McBride(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Tiffany McCellan(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Tiffany McCellan(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Shauna McKenzie(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Shauna McKenzie(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Elizabeth McNeil(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Elizabeth McNeil(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Megan S. Meredith(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Megan S. Meredith(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Riley S. Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Riley S. Murray(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Krystal K. Nash(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Krystal K. Nash(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Grace Nicassio(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Grace Nicassio(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Eric J. Nobriga Sr.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Eric J. Nobriga Sr.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Daniel Paiz(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Daniel Paiz(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Joe M. Quinteros(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Joe M. Quinteros(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Debra Reliford(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Debra Reliford(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Tristina Richards(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Tristina Richards(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Shannon Lynn Rimmer(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Shannon Lynn Rimmer(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Jeff Sandwell(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Jeff Sandwell(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Holly E. Santino(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Holly E. Santino(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Reylene D. Soto(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Reylene D. Soto(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Traivona Stapleton(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Traivona Stapleton(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandy Tatelman(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandy Tatelman(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Amber Van Voorhis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Amber Van Voorhis(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Cindy Vandyke(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Cindy Vandyke(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandra Venables(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandra Venables(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandra Villalba(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Sandra Villalba(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Israel Samuel Villalobos(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Israel Samuel Villalobos(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Stella Walz(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Stella Walz(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Courtney Nicole Winters(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Courtney Nicole Winters(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Kelly Yeakel(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Kelly Yeakel(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Erik Zaluske(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Erik Zaluske(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Troy O. Zeeman(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Troy O. Zeeman(pty:dft)) (Robinson, Daniel)
October 20, 2018 Filing 216 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Edwin Lanier served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edwin Lanier in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 20, 2018 Filing 215 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Leonel M. Plata Jr. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leonel M. Plata in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 20, 2018 Filing 214 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Dorothy Sigala served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dorothy Sigala in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 213 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Erik Zaluske filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 212 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Lexi Ann McIntosh filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 211 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Hiram Hairston filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Shawn Olivarez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Melissa Arroyo filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Philip Loncar filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 208 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Miriama Amina Walker filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Zahra Watkins filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Federico Jesus Avlla re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Matthew Cady filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 205 DECLARATION of Akiba Miniefee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Leticia Cannon filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 204 DECLARATION of Jonathan McBride re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Nitisha Ferguson filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re April L. Hagen filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Darralyn Thompson filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Lorenzo Joshua Perez filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 200 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Isaac Xavier Orozco filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Jonathan McBride re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Austin Marcus filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Derrick Gagiardi filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 197 DECLARATION of Allan Mendieta re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Masoud Pazouki filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 196 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Roberta B. Newton filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 195 DECLARATION of Debra Sousa re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Steven Resnick filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 194 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Vanessa Mallory filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Akiba Miniefee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Brandi Williams filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 192 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Cathy Barquist filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 191 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Kishawna Scott filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 190 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Lekecia Turner filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 189 DECLARATION of Debra Sousa re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Joel Twycross filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 188 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Joann Stoudemire filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 18, 2018 Filing 187 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint served on October 18, 2018. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 186 DECLARATION of Federico Jesus Avlla re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Kathleen Jo Peterson filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 185 DECLARATION of Federico Jesus Avlla re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Evelyne Morris filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 184 DECLARATION of Debra Sousa re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Sylvia Brooks filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Demetrius Trammel filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re David Blashaw filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 181 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Levelle Rivers filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 180 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Laterrius D. Peters filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 179 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Bradley Resnick filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 178 DECLARATION of John M. Salazar re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Michael McClain filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 177 DECLARATION of Ruthie Lee Duran re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Kimberly MacArthur filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Kenneth W. Yule re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Africa Allen filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 175 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Namari January filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 174 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Keri James filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 173 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Cheri Lynn Howard filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 172 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Sadat Merriwether filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 171 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Joseph Agosta III filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 170 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Swatavia Bowles filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 169 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Daniel Schirmbeck re Myra Randle filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 168 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Michael Jenkins re Brandy Harmon filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 167 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Michael Jenkins re Brandy Harmon filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 166 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Steve Wierzbinski III re Brandy Harmon filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 165 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Steve Wierzbinski III re Nancy L. Feyma filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 164 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Steve Wierzbinski re Dave Floen filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 163 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Steve Wierzbinski re Coryne Lippert filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 162 NON SERVICE REPORT of Summons #11 and Complaint #1 by Steve Wierzbinski re Robin McCormick filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Dustin Mascaro filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Myron Dye filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Michael Sambrano filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 158 DECLARATION of Gabriel Lara re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence re Cherie Jean Adams filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 157 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Leticia Marie Staggs served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leticia Staggs in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 156 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant BRENDA ARCE served on 10/13/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gary Arce in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 155 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Amelia B. Morales served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amelia Morales in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 154 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terry McGee - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 153 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Venetia White served on 10/13/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Johnny White - Co-Resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 152 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Taylor Winston served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melissa Sadlyer - Notary Public in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 151 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ALIYAH HOWARD served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aliyah Howard in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 150 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Israel Samuel Villalobos served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rosa Villalobos - Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyen, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 149 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint served on October 12, 2018. (Doyen, Michael)
October 12, 2018 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Ysa Albert filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Lori A. Young filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Nanita Williams filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Gerard Washack filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Federico Jesus Avlla re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Todd Sudakoff filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Collearen Randolph filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Akiba Miniefee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Rosemary Phillips filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Christina Melgoza filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Allan Mendieta re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Sundae McDowell filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Philip Loncar filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 138 DECLARATION of Debra Sousa re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Jeffrey Holden filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 137 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Vernell Gibson filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 136 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Jazelle Frelo filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Federico Jesus Avlla re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Alexis Cady filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 134 DECLARATION of Akiba Miniefee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Farrah Angelic filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Allan Mendieta re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Darline Varnsladson filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Allan Mendieta re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Juanita Toliver filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Albernisha Thomas filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Joshaway Stevens filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Jonathan McBride re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Rhasaan Simmons filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Lisa Boissiera-Wright filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Nedal Salman filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Felisha Roman filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Suelema Ramos filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Terrie Pettway filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Connie Manning filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Juan Reyes re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Courtney Lowe filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Trevor Anthony Garza filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Jonathan McBride re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Sierra M. Donnelly filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Norman Vilchez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Hailey Dequillettes filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Felicity Clark filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Akiba Miniefee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Constantino Cerrano filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Michael Muro re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Shamina Carpenter filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Joshua Bitrich filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 12, 2018 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Christian Canas re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Declaration of Diligence Re Service to Martin Bangma filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 113 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant COURTLAND BIBBS served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Courtland Bibbs in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 112 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Melinda Stilwell served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mr. Stilwell - Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 111 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant KIMBERLY A. DOWNES served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose M. Quinteros - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 110 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant KELVIN H. COACHMAN served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelvin H. Coachman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 109 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Elizabeth McNeil served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Occupant) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 108 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant LACEY BARTKO served on 10/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Robin Bartko / Co-Resident" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 107 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Emily Ann Trematerra served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 106 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Edward Trovato served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edward Trovato in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 105 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Joe M. Quinteros served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joe M. Quinteros in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 104 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant MINDY BITRICH served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mindy Bitrich in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 103 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Jeff Sandwell served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Sandwell in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 102 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Montee White served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Montee White in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 101 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Cindy Vandyke served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rex Vandyke, Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 100 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Courtney Nicole Winters served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Jennifer Winters / Occupant" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 99 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Linda Nooner served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mr. Nooner/Co-Resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 98 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Angel Echavarria, Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 97 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Daniel Paiz served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Dave Jones / Occupant" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 96 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Brenda Topete served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brenda Topete in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 95 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Sandy Tatelman served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sandy Tatelman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 94 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant DONNA JEAN ADCOCK served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Donna Jean Adcock in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 93 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Holly E. Santino served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Holly E. Santino in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 92 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant BRITTANY GOOD served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brittany Good in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 91 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant GLENN J. DORMER served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wendy Dormer (Wife) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Shauna McKenzie served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shauna McKenzie in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant JERRALYNN HICKS served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jerralynn Hicks in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 88 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Shannon Lynn Rimmer served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marrisa Rimmer, Daughter in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ROSEMARY GARCIA served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rosemary Garcia in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 86 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant EDWINNA BRAME served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deandre Pruitt - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Levin, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Traivona Stapleton served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Traivona Stapleton in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Dolores M. Solano served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Jacob Solano / Son" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 83 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant TARA BURFIELD served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 82 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Debra Reliford served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Debra Reliford in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 81 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Doe / Brother" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 80 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant TERRENCE BIRDEN served on 10/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shemeka Doe, Co-Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant IYANA GAINES served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Claudia Drake - Occupant" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Sandra Villalba served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sandra Villalba in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant TERESA DELEON HILL served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Do - Resident" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Morgan Moeller served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Morgan Moeller in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Kaitlin Manahan served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Male Occupant - Would not provide relationship" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Reylene D. Soto served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Joseph, Father-in-Law in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Riley S. Murray served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Morris, Grandma in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Coral Nettles served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Coral Nettles in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Anthony Mayshack served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Sister in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Rachel Roach served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Roach, Sister in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant NKOSI S. JOHNSON-KIMBER served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brenden Kimber, Sibling in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant GRACE KAJIMURA served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Co-Resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant OLEG GALAGAN served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elena Knoefler, Mother of Servee -Parent and or Guardian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Erenia Mijangos served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Erwin, Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant TABIA J. JOHNSON served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mrs. Johnson, Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deborah, Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Courtney N. Mayo served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Courtney N. Mayo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ROY EUWING served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Antawn(?), Son in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant PAMELA GOMEZ served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terry, Tia/Aunt in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Anne B. Krieghoff served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anne B. Krieghoff in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Gregory L. Manis served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Laurie L. Manis served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Megan S. Meredith served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Deneica Watkins served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe / occupant - Boyfriend in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Eric J. Nobriga Sr. served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margarita Doe - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant AMY HARRICK served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Tenant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant DANETTE COLASIN served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Tenant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Holly L. Mayes served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant REYNITA BANABAN served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Lori Anne McElroy served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mathew Gonzalez - Son in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Valarie Lofton served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Valarie Lofton in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Krystal K. Nash served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Nash - Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Greg Loring served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Greg Loring in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant DANIEL D. KNIGHT served on 10/7/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Knight - Wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Kelly Yeakel served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Yeakel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Sandra Valenzuela-Norris served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cathy Valenzuela - Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Kimberly Ann Smith served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimberly Ann Smith in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bradley Hoffrichter in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Brooke Magorien served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Veronica Dawson - Mother to Brooke in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant LISA DIRADO-MORENO served on 9/23/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Dirado-Moreno in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Troy O. Zeeman served on 9/23/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Troy O. Zeeman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Theresa Mayshack served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Sister in Law in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ROSIE AMATULLI served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rosie Amatulli in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant DAMON GIPSON served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brother of Subject in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Anthony Thomas McBride served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anthony Thomas McBride in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant BABU BHUIYAN served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon J. Alam - Roommate/Friend in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Sandra Venables served on 9/23/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sandra Venables in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant JENNIFER GRIMSHAW served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vince - Stepfather of Jennifer Grimshaw in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Flosieta Ann Davis in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant ASMIK KOTOYAN served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daughter of Asmik Kotoyan in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Bryan Matthews served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bryan Matthews in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Stella Walz served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stella Walz in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert - Son in law in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant DEBORAH HIGGINS served on 9/24/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deborah Higgins in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jhai, Maria)
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA served on 9/23/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca - Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, upon Defendant Kimberly Payton served on 9/22/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brian, Brad)
October 10, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding Jeremy K. Beecher as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Keller Beecher added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Beecher, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maria Jhai counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding Maria Jhai as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Jhai added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Jhai, Maria)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding Daniel B. Levin as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Levin, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Michael Gildersleeve counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding John M. Gildersleeve as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Gildersleeve, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV18-06197 JAK (FFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials JFW on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #14 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 25, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Motion to Transfer and Centralize Before United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MGM's Motion to Transfer and Centralize Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407)(Kristovich, Bethany)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-08332 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge John F. Walter to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-06197 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethany W Kristovich counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding Bethany W. Kristovich as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Kristovich, Bethany)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brad Dennis Brian counsel for Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Adding Brad Dennis Brian as counsel of record for MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Bay LLC, MGM Resorts Festival Grounds, LLC, and MGM Resorts Venue Management, LLC. (Brian, Brad)
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to All Defendants. (esa)
July 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Robert Doyen on behalf of Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Pendency filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC, (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05564-JAK-FFM, 2:18-cv-05570-JAK-FFM, 2:18-cv-05640-JAK-FFM, 2:18-cv-06113 JAK-E (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Doyen, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22105913 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs MANDALAY BAY, LLC, MANDALAY RESORT GROUP, MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MANDALAY BAY, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MANDALAY RESORT GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM RESORTS FESTIVAL GROUNDS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Robert Doyen added to party MGM RESORTS VENUE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Doyen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGM Resorts International, et al v. Quintivia Abner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REYNITA BANABAN
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FLOEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWENDOLYN ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA ARCE
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA AGOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARVONNE FOLMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAQUANA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYATRA GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDAL S. BALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE ADKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR L. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW CADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT YSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABU BHUIYAN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON C. GURULE
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DELCID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY GOOD
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANECA GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH AGOSTA III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYRON DYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERI JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE BRIMHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY HIGHTOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERIE JEAN ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL CHRISTENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARRAH ANGELIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZERONDRICK HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZELDA ADAME
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNA CAPUTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUANE DUBBS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTLAND BIBBS
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA BURFIELD
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORENA ESQUIBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRALYNN HICKS
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER CALEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTY R. GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAMARI JANUARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA EDMONDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE HOFFMASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT HIGGINS, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT HIGGINS, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY HOFFRICHTER
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMA GARCIA-FELIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMON GIPSON
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG FINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOSIETA ANN DAVIS
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAZELLE FRELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA JEAN ADCOCK
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERI LYNN HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINDY BITRICH
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXIS CADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABNER QUINTIVIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEARLINA CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY JORDAN CORUM
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA BOISSIERE-WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK L. HAMMERSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRIL L. HAGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY BAROUIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKITA HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BAQUEDANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELIAH FELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA STAR EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANICEY BRAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACEY BARTKO
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY EUWING
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INESSA GALAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH HIGGINS
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANETTE COLASIN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGRETTA GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA DIRADO-MORENO
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYLA BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY SCOTT HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FLUKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY LYNN HAYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY A. DOWNES
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEANU EDWARD ESTRADA
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERRICK GAGLIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINE ARUTUNYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFRICA ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDY BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRANCE BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARY GARCIA
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALFANI HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSIE AMATULLI
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELVIN H. COACHMAN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRIL HOPWOOD
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA GOMEZ
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELICITY CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMOYYAH IRVING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NITISHA FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Anthony Austin,, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACEY N. BALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA DELEON HILL
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA BITRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY ECHAVARRIA
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWINNA BRAME
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. GRIJALBA, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MICHAEL GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURIANNA JAYNE FENWICK
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELANIE LEANNE FISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTANTINO ANGELETAKIS
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTANTINO CERRANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDY HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES RAYMOND DEVOLL
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLEG GALAGAN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY JO HIEBERT
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN DALE BOES, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN FEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETH BARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN J. DORMER
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYESHA HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECILIA GALLEGOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LETICIA CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA LYNN BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRAM HAIRSTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNATHAN DUNDEE HUTCHINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIERRA M. DONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY CHARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIYAH HOWARD
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK BRIMHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERNELL GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVIER ALEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA FINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARO DUQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASMINE BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IYANA GAINES
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRENCE BIRDEN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL CHLEBOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER GRIMSHAW
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWATAVIA BOWLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDALL HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR ANTHONY GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLIE GUERRERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAVIS BARNETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY HARRICK
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BLASHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRESE DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAILEY DEQUILLETTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY L. FEYMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGMA MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY R. HOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAMINA CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA ARROYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE ANN DURAN-GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOLDEN FRANCHELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelisha Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paiz
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoreya Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sandwell
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe M. Quinteros
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ann Smith
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darline Varnsladson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Manis
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauntay Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin Manahan
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Topete
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alala Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Anne McElroy
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Loncar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Vandecar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YSA ALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan B. Virus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Van Voorhis
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jito Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany McCellan
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Jo Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erenia Mijangos
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Walz
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIVEK JAYARAMAN
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Stilwell
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYKENZIE KE'ALOHILANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Regnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Trovato
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiann Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Nicole Winters
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Venables
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suelema Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masoud Pazouki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deneica Watkins
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Lekavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelonda Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coryne Lippert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN BANGMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaqoia Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Luckadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Lynn Lazio
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahra Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reylene D. Soto
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Vandyke
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Sigala
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Ventresca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Tatelman
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASMIK KOTOYAN
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graciela Rebollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andra C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy O. Zeeman
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexi Ann McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry J. Speraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaja Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly E. Santino
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshaway Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Thomas McBride
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan S. Meredith
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Shaterian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collearen Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia B. Morales
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Nicassio
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles V. Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne B. Krieghoff
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Melgoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Murrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Lynn Rimmer
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felisha Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Matthews
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louella Abad Parga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Yeakel
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Mayshack
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Reliford
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Twycross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peejman Shadalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie L. Manis
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaila Requena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Chiyeko Miyakawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ANTHONY AUSTIN, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Gregory Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilianna Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMMIESHA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Neria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhasaan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mioshi Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie Lofton
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIRAM HAIRSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney N. Mayo
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta B. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Marie Staggs
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TABIA J. JOHNSON
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raekwon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laterrius D. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ogazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Waddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darralyn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jathan Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE FLOEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tankia Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Nooner
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Zackery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Thomas Schoenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lekecia Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levelle Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Susan Poppen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrie Pettway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albernisha Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Loring
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Zaluske
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Ann Trematerra
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zabrina Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ila Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetia White
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lee Skinner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle N. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Lanier
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Washack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Macarthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINTIVIA ABNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artrice Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leotis Tramble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Winston
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores M. Solano
Represented By: Robert M Adams
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]