Armando Bichara v. Kelly Santoro

Petitioner: Armando Bichara
Respondent: Kelly Santoro
Case Number: 2:2018cv06198
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
1 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 8 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Answer to Complaint #7 (Attachments: #1 CT 1 of 2, #2 CT 2 of 2, #3 RT 1 of 7, #4 RT 2 of 7, #5 RT 3 of 7, #6 RT 4 of 7, #7 RT 5 of 7, #8 RT 6 of 7, #9 RT 7 of 7, #10 LD 1 Opinion, #11 LD 2 AOB, #12 LD 3 RB, #13 LD 4 Reply Brf, #14 LD 5 App Supp LB, #15 LD 6 Resp Supp LB, #16 LD 7 Pet for Rev, #17 LD 8 Order)(Sanchez, Mary)
September 14, 2018 7 ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and Return; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent Kelly Santoro.(Sanchez, Mary)
July 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mary E Sanchez on behalf of Respondent Kelly Santoro (Attorney Mary E Sanchez added to party Kelly Santoro(pty:res))(Sanchez, Mary)
July 23, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING A RESPONSE/ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (hr)
July 18, 2018 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
July 17, 2018 3 **CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge **, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Armando Bichara. (From Document 1, filed and redocketed by Clerk) (esa)
July 17, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Armando Bichara. (Larson, Eric)
July 17, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), Receipt No. 0973-22105932 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Armando Bichara. (Attorney Eric R Larson added to party Armando Bichara(pty:pet))(Larson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armando Bichara v. Kelly Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando Bichara
Represented By: Eric R Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Santoro
Represented By: Mary E Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?