Raji Kitchen v. George Jaime
Petitioner: Raji Kitchen
Respondent: George Jaime
Case Number: 2:2018cv06514
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that Respondent is GRANTED to and including September 30, 2018, to file either a Motion to Dismiss or an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. #8 (sbou)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 First APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DECLARATION OF TAYLOR NGUYEN filed by Respondent George Jaime. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nguyen, Taylor)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Taylor Nguyen, Deputy Attorney General, on behalf of Respondent George Jaime. (Attorney Taylor T Nguyen added to party George Jaime(pty:res))(Nguyen, Taylor)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. that Respondent George Jaime file Answer to the Petition not later than 8/31/2018. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 8/31/2018. [See Order for details.] (Attachments: #1 Petition) (san)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTEs (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed July 16, 2018. The request is GRANTED. (sbou)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Raji Kitchen. The Petitioner does not consent. (ghap)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Stay and Abeyance filed by petitioner Raji Kitchen. (ghap)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Raji Kitchen. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raji Kitchen v. George Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raji Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Jaime
Represented By: Taylor T Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?