Roderick Washington v. John McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Washington
Defendant: G. Lozano, Delatore, Castenada, Alverez, J. Ballard, K. White, Porter, J. Ruiz, Cusamana, Gary Odebralski, Emily Robinson, Vyksim, P. Ruiz, Caldwell, R. De Beeves, Robert A. Loving Good, Wendie Lee Rivera, F. Reyes, Thang, E. F. Mastel, Morales, Thornberry, Ohennesian, A. Maldanado, B. Ginn, Resinik, Olsen, D. Baca, H. Miranda, Janice Rutherford, J. Bailey, Calvert, G. Esmond, Moorandian and John McMahon
Case Number: 2:2018cv06517
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Plaintiff promptly shall proceed with service of the summons and Complaint on all named Defendants. (see order for further details) (hr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 from Roderick Washington on 8/17/18. Re: Complaint - (Referred),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 . Receipt number LA176088. (jo)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER RE: Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Payment of Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within 30 days after this order, Plaintiff submit to the Court the filing fee of $400 or file a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis with the required supporting documentation. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that the Complaint be dismissed. It is so ordered. (mz)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by plaintiff Roderick Washington. (esa)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendantsAlverez(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in individual capacity), Alverez(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in official capacity), D. Baca(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), D. Baca(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), J. Bailey(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in individual capacity), J. Bailey(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in official capacity), J. Ballard(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), J. Ballard(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), Caldwell(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in official capacity), Caldwell(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in indvidual capacity), Calvert(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), Calvert(Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), Castenada(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in individual capacity), Castenada(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in official capacity), Cusamana(Under Sheriff, in individual capacity), Cusamana(Under Sheriff, in official capacity), R. De Beeves (Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), R. De Beeves (Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), Delatore(Sheriff Lieutenant, in individual capacity), Delatore(Sheriff Lieutenant, in official capacity), G. Esmond(Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), G. Esmond(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), B. Ginn(Sheriff Registred Nurse, in official capacity), B. Ginn(Sheriff Registred Nurse, in individual capacity), Robert A. Loving Good(Supervisor, in offical capacity), Robert A. Loving Good(Supervisor, in indiviudal capacity), G. Lozano(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), G. Lozano(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), A. Maldanado(Sheriff, Deputy, in official capacity), A. Maldanado(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), E. F. Mastel(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), E. F. Mastel(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), John McMahon(Sheriff, in individual capacity), John McMahon(Sherriff, in official capacity), H. Miranda(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), H. Miranda(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), Moorandian (No. 3189, Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), Moorandian (No. 3189, Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), Morales(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), Morales(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), Gary Odebralski(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), Gary Odebralski(Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), Ohennesian(Sheriff Lieutenant, in individual capacity), Ohennesian(Sheriff Lieutenant, in official capacity), Olsen(DDS, Sheriff Dentist, in official capacity), Olsen(DDS, Sheriff Dentist, in individual capacity), Porter(Sheriff Lieutenant, in official capacity), Porter(Sheriff Lieutenant, in individual capacity), Resinik(Sheriff Registred Nurse, in indvidual capacity), Resinik(Sheriff Registred Nurse, in official capacity), F. Reyes(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), F. Reyes(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), Wendie Lee Rivera(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor in individual capacity), Wendie Lee Rivera(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor in official capacity), Emily Robinson(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor, in official capacity), Emily Robinson(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor, in indvidual capacity), J. Ruiz(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), J. Ruiz(Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), P. Ruiz(Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity), P. Ruiz(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), Janice Rutherford(Supervisor, in individual capacity), Janice Rutherford(Supervisor, in official capacity), Thang(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor in individual capacity), Thang(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor, in official capacity), Thornberry(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in official capacity), Thornberry(Sheriff Custody Assistant, in individual capacity), Vyksim(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor, in individual capacity), Vyksim(MD, Sheriff Medical Doctor, in official capacity), K. White(Sheriff Sergeant, in official capacity), K. White (Sheriff Sergeant, in individual capacity) Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, filed by plaintiff Roderick Washington. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roderick Washington v. John McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castenada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alverez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cusamana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Odebralski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyksim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. De Beeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Loving Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendie Lee Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. F. Mastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thornberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohennesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Maldanado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ginn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Esmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moorandian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?