Richard Noreen v. Ana Gaeta et al

Plaintiff: Richard Norene
Defendant: Ana Gaeta and Sarahi Gomez
Case Number: 2:2018cv06681
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Receipt of Returned Remand Letter from the Los Angeles County Superior Court (bp)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Norwalk. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Norwalk. (bp)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bp)
August 8, 2018 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. (kl)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Defendants Ana Gaeta, Sarahi Gomez. (jtil)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ana Gaeta and Sarahi Gomez. (jtil)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, filed by Defendants Sarahi Gomez and Ana Gaeta..Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Noreen v. Ana Gaeta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarahi Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Norene
Represented By: Frederick L Spinrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?