Tara Inden v. PHH Home Loans et al

Plaintiff: Tara Inden
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Altisource Holdings, LLC, John or Jane Does and PHH Home Loans
Case Number: 2:2018cv06776
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Paul L Abrams
1 Judge: Maria A Audero
2 Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER AND NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: PLAINTIFF'S "OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION" by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall denying #23 REQUEST for Reconsideration: Accordingly, Plaintiff's objection to the September 10, 2018 Order is OVERRULED, and Plaintiff's request for reconsideration of said Order is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 23 OBJECTION AND REQUEST for Reconsideration filed by plaintiff Tara Inden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint #15 Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #15 #16 filed by Defendants Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC. (Katz, Jeremy)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: For the reasons stated herein, the Request to Consolidate #17 is denied. *See Order for further information.* (cw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST to Consolidate and Memorandum in Support of Their Request to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Tara Inden. (yl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint #15 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint filed by Defendants Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-16; Certificate of Service)(Katz, Jeremy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint filed by Defendant Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/9/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Katz, Jeremy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Tara Inden. Bank of America National Assn, et al was served on 9/4/2018. (yl)
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST to Consolidate and Memorandum in Support of their Request to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Tara Inden. (yl)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Request for Judicial Notice, #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint #12 , for the following reasons: hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; motion improperly noticed before Magistrate Judge Abrams. A motion to dismiss should be noticed before the Honorable Consuelo B. Marshall.; (ab)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 [STRICKEN-PURSUANT TO ORDER DOC. 14] REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint #12 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint filed by Defendants Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-16 and Certificate of Service)(Katz, Jeremy) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ab).
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 [STRICKEN-PURSUANT TO ORDER DOC. 14] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Tara Indens Complaint filed by Defendant Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Katz, Jeremy) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ab).
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC, identifying Bank of America Corporation and Ocwen Financial Corporation and Altisource Portfolio Solutions S.A.. (Attorney Jeremy Tsvi Katz added to party Altisource Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Tsvi Katz added to party Bank of America National Assn.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Tsvi Katz added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Tsvi Katz added to party PHH Home Loans (pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy Tsvi Katz added to party Western Progressive LLC(pty:dft))(Katz, Jeremy)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-06776 CBM(PLAx). (rn)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Certificate of Service By Mail Complain With Verification, Executed by Plaintiff Tara Inden, upon Defendant Altisource Holdings, LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Bank of America National Assn. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; PHH Home Loans served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018; Western Progressive LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (ab)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant PHH Home Loans. (bm)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Bank of America National Assn. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Altisource Holdings, LLC. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Western Progressive LLC. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tara Inden (car) (pj).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Altisource Holdings, LLC, Bank of America National Assn., John or Jane Does 1-10, unknown investors, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Home Loans, Western Progressive LLC.Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Tara Inden. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) Modified on 8/9/2018 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tara Inden v. PHH Home Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Tsvi Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Tsvi Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Assn.
Represented By: Jeremy Tsvi Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Tsvi Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Home Loans
Represented By: Jeremy Tsvi Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Inden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?