Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC v. Asbjorn Johnsen et al

Plaintiff: Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC
Defendant: Captains Adjusting Services, Inc., Magone Marine Service, Inc., North Sea Refrigeration Inc., Progressive Fisheries L.L.C., Marine Electric, Inc., Gary K. Wiggins, Odd Westrum and Asbjorn Johnsen
Case Number: 2:2018cv06842
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Asbjorn Johnsen, Marine Electric, Inc. #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests>>Request>>>CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Asbjorn Johnsen, Marine Electric, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Darling, Lafcadio)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than October 2, 2018 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants-Asbjorn Johnsen and Marine Electric, Inc. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.Answer by the defendant(s).No oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC, upon Defendant Marine Electric, Inc. served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Healy, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Darling, Lafcadio)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC, upon Defendant Asbjorn Johnsen served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Asbjorn Johnsen, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Darling, Lafcadio)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 as to defendants Captains Adjusting Services, Inc., Asbjorn Johnsen, Magone Marine Service, Inc., Marine Electric, Inc., North Sea Refrigeration Inc., Progressive Fisheries L.L.C., Odd Westrum, Gary K. Wiggins. (lc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. 1) No" et als" permitted on caption, please indicate see attached as to the face page of complaint as provided. 2) Filer indicated see attached in the "TO" AREA, however, the face of the complaint is NOT applicable. Please provide a second attachment of a LIST of defendants being served ONLY. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Face Complaint for List of Additional Defendants)(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. If you are issuing the summons to defendants other than Asbjorn Johnsen also, you must list them in the "To: defendants" section or indicate "See attached for additional defendants". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 filed by plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Face Complaint for List of Defendants)(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 08/09/2018, receipt number 097322227398), filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Payment Confirmation)(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC, (Attorney Lafcadio Darling added to party Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC(pty:pla))(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC. (Darling, Lafcadio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC v. Asbjorn Johnsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captains Adjusting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magone Marine Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Sea Refrigeration Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Fisheries L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary K. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odd Westrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbjorn Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunn Pacific Reflection LLC
Represented By: Lafcadio Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?