LeChonne Wright v. UnitedHealth Group, et al
Plaintiff: LECHONNE WRIGHT
Defendant: MELISSA RUBEL, OPTUM360, OPTUMRX, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, OPTUMINSIGHT, UnitedHealth Group Inc, JEFFERSON PATE JACKSON, LORRI ATKINS SIDES, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum360 Services, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Optuminsight, Inc. and Optumrx, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06931
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of California, 3:18-cv-02116 filed 9/12/2018. (iv)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: GGOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN and all parties having stipulated thereto, it is hereby ordered as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), and the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Electronic docket sheet sent. Electronic documents are accessible through PACER. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Change Venue to USDC, Southern District of California filed by Defendants Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suder, Morgan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer now due 9/19/2018; Optum360 Services, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018; Optumrx, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Optuminsight, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Optum360 Services, Inc.; Optumrx, Inc..(Suder, Morgan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer now due 9/4/2018; UnitedHealth Group answer now due 9/4/2018; Optum360 Services, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018; Optumrx, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Optuminsight, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; UnitedHealth Group; Optum360 Services, Inc.; Optumrx, Inc..(Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party UnitedHealth Group(pty:dft))(Suder, Morgan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
August 13, 2018 COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant UnitedHealth Group served on 7/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 15) (esa)
August 13, 2018 COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated served on 7/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 11) (esa)
August 13, 2018 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant Optumrx, Inc. served on 6/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 7) (esa)
August 13, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, Jefferson Pate Jackson, Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., Melissa Rubel, Lorri Atkins Sides, UnitedHealth Group, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff LeChonne Wright. (Filed in state court 6/19/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum360 Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jill M. Toth re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sharon A. Stuckmayer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Morgan P. Suder re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC710769 Receipt No: 0973-22246208 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons and Proofs of Service), #3 Exhibit C (All Other State Court Documents), #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party UnitedHealth Group Inc(pty:dft))(Suder, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeChonne Wright v. UnitedHealth Group, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMRX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON PATE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORRI ATKINS SIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Marissa L Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum360 Services, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Marissa L Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Marissa L Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optumrx, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Marissa L Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECHONNE WRIGHT
Represented By: Mona Tashroudian
Represented By: Melvin L Felton
Represented By: Nancy L Abrolat
Represented By: David Ali Tashroudian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?