Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd. v. John Does 1-5
Plaintiff: ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD. and Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd.
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 and John Does
Case Number: 2:2018cv07441
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo)Co., Ltd., designating Jon L. Rewsinki as local counsel #13 . (iv)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE #12 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court GRANTS the Application. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22370658) filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Rewinski, Jon)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(F) Conference filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(F) Conference, #2 Proposed Order Re Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(F) Conference, #3 Declaration of Jon L. Rewinski In Support of Ex Parte Application, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jon L. Rewinski, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jon L. Rewinski)(Rewinski, Jon)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan Harrison. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants John Does 1-5. (jtil)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie Mei Cheng counsel for Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.. Adding Jamie M. Cheng as counsel of record for Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Jamie Mei Cheng added to party ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.(pty:pla))(Cheng, Jamie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.. (Rewinski, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.. (Rewinski, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD. (Rewinski, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD., identifying Plaintiff Ace Gift & Craft (Ningbo) Co., Ltd.. (Rewinski, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.. (Rewinski, Jon)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22311788 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jon L Rewinski added to party ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.(pty:pla))(Rewinski, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd. v. John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE GIFT & CRAFT (NINGBO) CO., LTD.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Represented By: Jon L Rewinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace Gift and Craft Ningbo Co Ltd.
Represented By: Jamie Mei Cheng
Represented By: Jon L Rewinski
Represented By: Bryan G Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?