Eric Wayne Bennett v. Ronald Davis

Petitioner: Eric Wayne Bennett
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 2:2018cv07524
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren Collins on behalf of Petitioner Eric Wayne Bennett (Attorney Lauren Collins added to party Eric Wayne Bennett(pty:pet))(Collins, Lauren)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Saivandana Peterson on behalf of PETITIONER Eric Wayne Bennett. Filed by PETITIONER Eric Wayne Bennett. (Attorney Saivandana Peterson added to party Eric Wayne Bennett(pty:pet))(Peterson, Saivandana)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF NOTIFICATION RE: STAY OF EXECUTION/FINAL DISPOSITION ORDER (es)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER STAYING EXECUTION AND APPOINTING COUNSEL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, re Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #3 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the execution of Petitioner's sentence of death and all court and other proceedings related to the execution of that sentence, including preparation for execution and setting an execution date, are stayed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender of the Central District is appointed as counsel for petitioner ERIC WAYNE BENNETT in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 90 days of the date of this Amended Order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint statement with the Court. (iv)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STAYING EXECUTION OF DEATH SENTENCE AND APPOINTING COUNSEL #1 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the execution of petitioner's sentence of death and all court and other proceedings related to the execution of that sentence, including preparation for execution and the setting of an execution date, are stayed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent Petitioner, Eric Wayne Bennett in this case. (iv)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT and Commencement of Capital Habeas Corpus Case. This capital habeas case was initiated on 8/28/2018 and has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. (ghap)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST BY Prisoner for Appointment of Counsel in California Death Sentence Case and for Stay of Execution of Death Sentence; Declaration of Eric Wayne Bennett, filed by petitioner Eric Wayne Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Wayne Bennett v. Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Wayne Bennett
Represented By: Lauren Collins
Represented By: Federal Public Defender
Represented By: Saivandana Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?