Abelino Manriquez v. Ronald Davis

Petitioner: Abelino Manriquez
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 2:2018cv07713
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kim Aarons on behalf of Respondent Ronald Davis (Attorney Kim Aarons added to party Ronald Davis(pty:res))(Aarons, Kim)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Susel B Orellana on behalf of Petitioner Abelino Manriquez. Filed by Petitioner Abelino Manriquez. (Attorney Susel B Orellana added to party Abelino Manriquez(pty:pet))(Orellana, Susel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Jennifer Molayem on behalf of Petitioner Abelino Manriquez. Filed by Petitioner Abelino Manriquez. (Attorney Jennifer Molayem added to party Abelino Manriquez(pty:pet))(Molayem, Jennifer)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE PROOF OF NOTIFICATION Re: Stay of Execution/Final Disposition Order. (jp)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STAYING EXECUTION AND APPOINTING COUNSEL #1 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the execution of Petitioner's sentence of death and all court and other proceedings related to the execution of that sentence, including preparation for execution and setting an execution date, are stayed. The stay shall be in effect for ninety days from the date of this Order. [See order for further details.] (es)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT and Commencement of Capital Habeas Corpus Case. This capital habeas case was initiated on 9/5/2018 and has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. (ghap)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST by Prisoner for Appointment of Counsel in California Death Sentence Case and Stay of Execution of Death Sentence; Declaration of Abelino Manriquez, filed by petitioner Abelino Manriquez. (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abelino Manriquez v. Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kim Aarons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abelino Manriquez
Represented By: Jennifer Molayem
Represented By: Susel B Orellana
Represented By: Federal Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?