Zac Cetrone v. Michael Macaluso et al
Plaintiff: Zac Cetrone
Defendant: Philip H Coelho, David R Stevens, David Bar-Or, Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Thomas E Chilcott, Michael Macaluso and Richard B Giles
Case Number: 2:2018cv07855
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Deborah S. Birnbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens (Pro Hac Vice Fe #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 Erroneous pdfs of orders for same attorneys on a different case attached in error. Correct pdfs were replaced and attached to this notice for reference. (lc)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Deborah S. Birnbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens designating Galen A. Phillips as local counsel #12 by Judge S. James Otero. (lc) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/15/2018) (lc).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ian Stearns to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens designating Galen A. Phillips #11 as local counsel by Judge S. James Otero. (lc) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/15/2018) (lc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Deborah S. Birnbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22530888) filed by Defendant Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phillips, Galen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ian Stearns to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22530732) filed by Defendant(s). Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Galen Phillips added to party Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party David Bar-Or(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party Thomas E Chilcott(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party Philip H Coelho(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party Richard B Giles(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party Michael Macaluso(pty:dft), Attorney Galen Phillips added to party David R Stevens(pty:dft)) (Phillips, Galen)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-07476 SJO(RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07855 SJO(RAOx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero (rn)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Bar-Or, Thomas E Chilcott, Philip H Coelho, Richard B Giles, Michael Macaluso, David R Stevens. (car)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Zac Cetrone, (Moest, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Zac Cetrone. (Moest, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Zac Cetrone. (Moest, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22392874 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Zac Cetrone. (Attorney Robert C Moest added to party Zac Cetrone(pty:bkmov))(Moest, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zac Cetrone v. Michael Macaluso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip H Coelho
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R Stevens
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bar-Or
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Chilcott
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Macaluso
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B Giles
Represented By: Galen Phillips
Represented By: Deborah S Birnbach
Represented By: Ian Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zac Cetrone
Represented By: Robert C Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?