Norma Elizabeth Buenostro v. Northeast Valley Health Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,, Northeast Valley Health Corporation, United States of America and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07859
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss without leave to amend as amendment would be futile. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II: RE MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 . Counsel address the issues raised by the Court with respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Case as stated on the record. The Court takes the motion under submission and a ruling will be issued. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (lc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY OPPOSITION TO MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Meredith Torres Attached in support Thereof #8 filed by Defendant United States of America. (Staub, Keith)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Loan Thi Dao counsel for Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro. Artin Sodaify is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naranjo Buenostro. (Dao, Loan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Loan T. Dao on behalf of Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro. Filed by Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro (Attorney Loan Thi Dao added to party Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro(pty:pla))(Dao, Loan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro. (Valencia, Everardo)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Meredith Torres Attached in support Thereof filed by DEFENDANT United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staub, Keith)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to provisions of 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(2) the United States of America is substituted as theDefendant herein in place and instead of Northeast Valley Health Corporation re Notice (Other) #5 (lc)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution filed by DEFENDANT Northeast Valley Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Staub, Keith)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
September 10, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Does 1-100, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/1/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Northeast Valley Health Corporation. (Staub, Keith)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC 682572 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by DEFENDANT Northeast Valley Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Keith M Staub added to party Northeast Valley Health Corporation(pty:dft))(Staub, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Elizabeth Buenostro v. Northeast Valley Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Elizabeth Naran Buenostro
Represented By: Artin Sodaify
Represented By: Everardo Vargas Valencia
Represented By: Loan Thi Dao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Valley Health Corporation
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?