Chadwick McQueen et al v. Ferrari N.V., et al

Plaintiff: City National Bank and Chadwick McQueen
Defendant: Ferrari N.V., Ferrari North America, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07923
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
1 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc.'s time to respond to the Complaint shall be extended until and including November 9, 2018. (iv)
October 19, 2018 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 9, 2018 filed by Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sims, Nancy)
October 16, 2018 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the pending Order to Show Cause, the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2018 11 Featured Case CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Response to OSC, filed 10/12/18 #10 . The Court CONTINUES the Order to Show Cause to 12/10/18. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 12, 2018 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs City National Bank, Chadwick McQueento Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #9 (Wesley, Keith)
September 25, 2018 9 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following no later than October 12, 2018 as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Proof of service of summons and complaint. Response to Complaint by the defendant or an application for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
September 19, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/19/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Joint Rule 26(f) Meeting Report is due 11/5/2018. SO ORDERED. (cw)
September 17, 2018 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ferrari North America, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018, filed by Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc..(Sims, Nancy)
September 13, 2018 6 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Chadwick McQueen.. (Wang, Ivy)
September 12, 2018 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 12, 2018 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
September 12, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ferrari N.V., Ferrari North America, Inc., filed by plaintiffs City National Bank, Chadwick McQueen. (Filed in state court 7/30/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
September 12, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc., identifying Chadwick McQueen (Plaintiff); City National Bank, as Trustee of the Terry McQueen Testamentary Trust (Plaintiff); Ferrari N.V. (Defendant); Ferrari North America, Inc. (Defendant). (Sims, Nancy)
September 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Sims, Nancy)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, Superior Court, case number BC715754 Receipt No: 0973-22408505 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Declaration of D. Donaldson) (Attorney Nancy Nguyen Sims added to party Ferrari North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sims, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadwick McQueen et al v. Ferrari N.V., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrari N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrari North America, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Nguyen Sims
Represented By: Andrew Lawrence Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City National Bank
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Ivy A Wang
Represented By: Peter W Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick McQueen
Represented By: Keith J Wesley
Represented By: Ivy A Wang
Represented By: Peter W Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?