Vahe Aftandilian v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Vahe Aftandilian
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Clear Recon Corp, U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust, U.S. Bank National Association, Bank of America, N.A. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07929
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND #9 . This case shall close.( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. [ecf #9], set for October 29, 2018. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dineen, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Vahe Aftandilian. (Rodriguez, Patricia)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., regarding Removal Documents and Standing Orders served on Defendant Clear Recon Corp. served on 9/26/18. (Dineen, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint (conformed))(Dineen, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of John Dineen, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Proof of Service) (Dineen, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Guy Halgren counsel for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Adding Matthew G. Halgren as counsel of record for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Banc of America Funding 2007-C Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Banc of America Funding 2007-C Trust. (Attorney Matthew Guy Halgren added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Guy Halgren added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Guy Halgren added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Halgren, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., of Civil Standing Order served on 9/18/18. (Dineen, John)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-07929 SJO(GJSx). (rn)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
September 12, 2018 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Clear Recon Corp, Does 1 through 10, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Vahe Aftandilian. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
September 12, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Clear Recon Corp, Does, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Vahe Aftandilian. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/16/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Co., Bank of America Corporation, U.S. Bancorp. (Dineen, John)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dineen, John)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC706553 Receipt No: 0973-22410204 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney John C Dineen added to party BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,(pty:dft), Attorney John C Dineen added to party U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust(pty:dft), Attorney John C Dineen added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Dineen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vahe Aftandilian v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahe Aftandilian
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,
Represented By: John C Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John C Dineen
Represented By: Matthew Guy Halgren
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Banc Of America Funding 2007-C Trust
Represented By: John C Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Matthew Guy Halgren
Represented By: John C Dineen
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Guy Halgren
Represented By: John C Dineen
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?