Keith J. McNamara et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Keith J. McNamara and Patricia McNamara
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC, Carolyn Ashwal, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and Alex Ashwal
Case Number: 2:2018cv07962
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 27 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #22 filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. (Murphy, Susan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #19 is continued to December 3, 2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Julie Ann Choi on behalf of Defendants Alex Ashwal, Carolyn Ashwal, Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC (Attorney Julie Ann Choi added to party Alex Ashwal (pty:dft), Attorney Julie Ann Choi added to party Carolyn Ashwal (pty:dft), Attorney Julie Ann Choi added to party Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC(pty:dft))(Choi, Julie)
October 29, 2018 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #19 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #22 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Reeves, Dean)
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) (Reeves, Dean)
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #19 filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RJN- 1, #2 Exhibit RJN-2, #3 Exhibit RJN-3, #4 Exhibit RJN-4, #5 Exhibit RJN-5, #6 Exhibit RJN-6, #7 Exhibit RJN-7, #8 Exhibit RJN-8, #9 Declaration Proof of Service)(Murphy, Susan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Murphy, Susan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. (Murphy, Susan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. (Murphy, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. upon Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by JULIE CHOI. (Murphy, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by PlaintiffS Patricia McNamara. upon Carolyn Ashwal waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by JULIE CHOI. (Murphy, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. upon Alex Ashwal waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by JULIE CHOI. (Murphy, Susan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Patricia McNamara. Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Summons (Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #7 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Wells Fargo's Motion DENIED as moot and the hearing set for October 29, 2018, is VACATED. Wells Fargo shall respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before October 25, 2018. (iv)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Keith J. McNamara (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Declaration Proof of Service)(Murphy, Susan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint #7 is continued to 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-02131 MWF(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07962 MWF(AGRx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #7 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Reeves, Dean)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Reeves, Dean)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-02131-MWF (Reeves, Dean)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
September 13, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiffs Keith J. McNamara and Patricia McNamara in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/30/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Co.. (Reeves, Dean)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District, case number BC715909 Receipt No: 0973-22416907 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Dean A Reeves added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Reeves, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith J. McNamara et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dean A Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC
Represented By: Julie Ann Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Ashwal
Represented By: Julie Ann Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Ashwal
Represented By: Julie Ann Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J. McNamara
Represented By: Susan M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McNamara
Represented By: Susan M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?