Bryan Williams v. Ordonez Realty Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Defendant: Ordonez Realty Group, LLC, Whittier Eye Center and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07985
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
1 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 12/17/2018 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
October 25, 2018 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ordonez Realty Group, LLC, Whittier Eye Center, identifying Bryan Williams, Ordonez Realty Group, LLC; Xavier P Ordonez OD APC (erroneously sued as Whittier Eye Center). (Mangarpan, Tina)
October 25, 2018 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Ordonez Realty Group, LLC, Whittier Eye Center.. (Mangarpan, Tina)
October 25, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Ordonez Realty Group, LLC, Whittier Eye Center.(Attorney Tina I. Mangarpan added to party Ordonez Realty Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tina I. Mangarpan added to party Whittier Eye Center(pty:dft))(Mangarpan, Tina)
October 8, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Whittier Eye Center served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Whittier Eye Center by Xavier P. Ordonez, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
October 8, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Ordonez Realty Group, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Oronez Realty Group, LLC by Xavier P. Ordonez, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
September 28, 2018 9 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
September 26, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07985 MWF(FFMx). (rn)
September 17, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ordonez Realty Group, LLC, Whittier Eye Center. (car)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
September 14, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22420252 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Bryan Williams(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan Williams v. Ordonez Realty Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ordonez Realty Group, LLC
Represented By: Tina I. Mangarpan
Represented By: Kelly A Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittier Eye Center
Represented By: Tina I. Mangarpan
Represented By: Kelly A Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?