Etta Hindra v. Deutsche Bank National Trust et al

Plaintiff: Etta Hindra
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Deutsche Bank National Trust
Case Number: 2:2018cv08167
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
1 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu. The Court recognizes that Plaintiff seems to have a handful of somewhat "new" causes of action in the Complaint as compared to her related cases. But, as Magistrate Judge Oliver discussed, the Complaint merely has a caption page with no factual allegations whatsoever within the document. In other words, the Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. In addition, Plaintiff does not assert any federal question and/or diversity jurisdiction in the Complaint, meriting dismissal. Taking these issues into consideration, the Court denies Plaintiff's Extension Request and thereby dismisses the action without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to provide payment by the applicable date. (mrgo)
October 31, 2018 12 MEET AND CONFER filed by plaintiff Etta Hindra. (mrgo)
October 29, 2018 11 REQUEST EXTENSION OF TIME ONE MONTH UNTIL 11/28/18, TO MAKE THE PAYMENT filed by plaintiff Etta Hindra. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case with Proof of Service #9 filed by Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6-10)(Beall, Kelly)
October 25, 2018 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case with Proof of Service filed by defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust. Motion set for hearing on 12/6/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beall, Kelly)
October 25, 2018 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust, (Attorney Kelly Andrew Beall added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust(pty:dft))(Beall, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IF FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (mrgo)
September 24, 2018 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml)
September 21, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06150 GW(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08167 GW(AGRx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
September 20, 2018 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 20, 2018 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
September 20, 2018 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Etta Hindra. (lh)
September 20, 2018 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Etta Hindra, (lh)
September 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust, Does.Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Etta Hindra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etta Hindra v. Deutsche Bank National Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Hindra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Stuart B Wolfe
Represented By: Kelly Andrew Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?