Golden State Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Golden State Water Company
Defendant: J.R. Simplot Company, FMC Corporation, Dow AgroSciences LLC, Shell Chemical Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company, Crop Production Services Inc., Does 1 through 300, inclusive, Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company and Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv08199
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah Peterman Bell counsel for Defendant FMC Corporation. Adding Sarah Peterman Bell as counsel of record for FMC Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attorney Sarah Peterman Bell added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Bell, Sarah)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Hannon Colopy counsel for Defendant FMC Corporation. Adding James H. Colopy as counsel of record for FMC Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attorney James Hannon Colopy added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Colopy, James)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08199 MWF(SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
October 24, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #34 by J.R. Simplot Company. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 34 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company (Snider, Stephen)
October 23, 2018 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company (Snider, Stephen)
October 23, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company.(Attorney Stephen C Snider added to party J.R. Simplot Company(pty:dft))(Snider, Stephen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FMC Corporation, re Corporate Disclosure Statement #29 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #30 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #28 served on 10/22/2018. (Sobczynski, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corporation, identifying FMC CORPORATION, VANGUARD GROUP, BLACKROCK, INC., STATE STREET CORPORATION. (Sobczynski, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FMC Corporation identifying VANGUARD GROUP as Corporate Parent. (Sobczynski, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by FMC CORPORATION FMC Corporation.(Attorney Linda Teresa Sobczynski added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Sobczynski, Linda)
October 22, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Smith counsel for Defendants Crop Production Services Inc., Shell Oil Company. Adding Christopher W. Smith as counsel of record for Defendants Shell Oil Company d/b/a "Shell Chemical Company" and Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc f/k/a "Crop Production Services, Inc." for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company and Nutien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher W Smith added to party Crop Production Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher W Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., formerly known as "Crop Production Services, Inc." (Defendant); Golden State Water Company (Plaintiff); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant); Dow Agrosciences LLC (Defendant); Shell Oil Company, formerly doing business as "Shell Chemical Company" (Defendant); J.R. Simplot Company (Defendant); FMC Corporation (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
October 22, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Shell Petroleum N.V. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dow AgroSciences LLC, identifying Mycogen LLC, Centen AG, LLC, DDP AgroSciences US DCOMCO, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, DowDuPont Inc.. (Kropp, Garner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 22 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying DowDuPont, Inc.. (Kropp, Garner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions Dow AgroSciences LLC, The Dow Chemical Company. (Kropp, Garner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Dow AgroSciences LLC, The Dow Chemical Company. Related Case(s): 5:18-cv-02022 (Kropp, Garner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Dow AgroSciences LLC, The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Garner F Kropp added to party Dow AgroSciences LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Garner F Kropp added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Kropp, Garner)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Crop Production Services Inc. identifying Nutrien Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crop Production Services Inc., identifying Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., formerly known as "Crop Production Services, Inc." (Defendant); Golden State Water Company (Plaintiff); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant); Dow Agrosciences LLC (Defendant); Shell Oil Company, formerly doing business as "Shell Chemical Company" (Defendant); J.R. Simplot Company (Defendant); FMC Corporation (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crop Production Services Inc..(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Crop Production Services Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08199 ODW(KSx). (rn)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Crop Production Services Inc., Dow AgroSciences LLC, FMC Corporation, J.R. Simplot Company, Shell Oil Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (lc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88), Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: 1) Filer incorrectly chose 2 events Request to issue subpoena and summons request. Please use ONLY Summons Request; 2) The "TO:" must name at least one defendant...in addition to the "see attachment". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. 1) Case number to include official Judge and Magistrates initials as: 2:18-cv-08199-CAS-KS; 2) The "TO:" area cannot be "BLANK". Please name the defendant to be served, or if multiple defendants to be served, name them accordingly. Please be advised: An attachment naming the defendants to be served may be attached to the summons. and to be identified as "SEE ATTACHMENT". ( the caption page as submitted is only for the caption portion and is NOT applicable as to the "TO:" area). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company identifying American States Water Company as Corporate Parent. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company, identifying American States Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Mansergh, Seth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22463060 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Golden State Water Company. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Golden State Water Company(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden State Water Company v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Simplot Company
Represented By: Stephen C Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: James Hannon Colopy
Represented By: Sarah Peterman Bell
Represented By: Linda Teresa Sobczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow AgroSciences LLC
Represented By: Garner F Kropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Garner F Kropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crop Production Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Water Company
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?