World Chandlering International, Inc. v. MT Megacore Philomena et al

Defendant: Hurricane Navigation, Inc. and MT Megacore Philomena
Intervenor Plaintiff: World Chandlering International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08260
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
1 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The telephonic Status Conference on November 8, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. #21 is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF PROCEEDS OF JUDICIAL SALE AS TO CLAIM OF WORLD CHANDLERING INTERNATIONAL, INC. #26 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Having found good cause, the Court orders the disbursement of $13,179.65 in satisfaction of WCI's claim. The Court orders the Clerk of the Court to issue a check from the Court's registry in the amount of $13,179.65 payable to "Roberts & Kehagiaras LLP, In Trust," to the following address: Roberts & Kehagiaras LLP, One World Trade Center, Suite 2350, Long Beach, CA 90831. (hr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Disbursement of Funds to World Chandlering International, Inc. filed by plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order #21 , a telephonic Status Conference is set for November 8, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation for Disbursement of Funds #22 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #23 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The Document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file a corrected document as soon as possible. (hr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Disbursement of Funds #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation is missing Hurricane Navigation, Inc.'s counsel's signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
November 1, 2018 Filing 22 **STRICKEN PER DOCKET NO. #24 ** STIPULATION for Disbursement of Funds to World Chandlering International, Inc. filed by plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Kehagiaras, Andrew) Modified on 11/2/2018 (hr).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND STATUS CONFERENCE; AND VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that World Chandlering shall file its verified claim in this action on or before November 1, 2018. Any objections shall be filed on or before November 13, 2018. Any responses or reply briefs shall be filed on or before November 20, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is set for a telephonic Status Conference on November 8, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. The Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and the parties are relieved of the obligation of filing a Joint Report. (see order for further details) (hr)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: IT IS ORDERED that a scheduling conference is set for Thursday, November 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 550. The parties are ordered to file, on or before Wednesday, October 31, 2018, a Joint Report that contains a proposed schedule and covers topics such as potential consolidation and applicable subjects in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1. (see order for details) (hr)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to Defendants All Defendants. (kl)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re: Further Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #16 filed by plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Intervenor Complaint #1 , filed by plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 12-01 is approved by District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:18-cv-08260 AGR. (Attachments: #1 consent statement) (rn)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Re: Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE WCI'S REQUEST FOR REVIEW AND ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST OF VESSEL OR, ALTERNATIVELY, PROCEEDS OF JUDICIAL SALE IN COURT REGISTRY #4 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that WCI's Request for Review and Application for Warrant of Arrest of Vessel is DENIED and Alternative Application for Warrant of Arrest of Proceeds of Judicial Sale in Court Registry is DENIED AS UNNECESSARY. Nothing in this order precludes service of the complaint. (see order for further details) (hr)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The parties to this action are advised as follows: The parties may consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all further proceedings in this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b), if ALL PARTIES, including any unserved parties, consent to the jurisdiction of that Magistrate Judge. Consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge may be withheld by any party without any adverse consequences. If a case is reassigned to a Magistrate Judge, any appeal from a judgment of that Magistrate Judge shall be taken to the United States Court of Appeals in the same manner as an appeal from any other judgment of the District Court, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(3). (See document for further details) (mrgo)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Intervenor Plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. Exhibit "B" as to Intervenor Complaint #1 . (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Intervenor Plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. Exhibit "A" as to Intervenor Complaint #1 . (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 25, 2018 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-22481361 for $400 filing fee. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-09010-AGR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 16-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-09010 AGR. Case referred from Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:18-cv-08260 SVW(AGRx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (rn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST for Review in Accordance with Supplemental Rule C; Application for Order: (1) Directing Clerk to Issue Warrant for Arrest in Action In Rem in Accordance with Rule C; and (2) Confirming Substitute Custodian; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, filed by Intervenor Plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (lh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Intervenor Plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc., (lh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Intervenor Complaint #1 as to Defendant MT Megacore Philomena. (lh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Defendants Hurricane Navigation, Inc., MT Megacore Philomena, filed by Intervenor Plaintiff World Chandlering International, Inc. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Chandlering International, Inc. v. MT Megacore Philomena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: World Chandlering International, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Hall Adkinson
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurricane Navigation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Megacore Philomena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?