Shayna Amster v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Shayna Amster
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08327
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Remand Case to #12 in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Mukherjee, Ruchira)
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, (Mukherjee, Ruchira)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Request and Request to File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court [Re. Docket No. 18] filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina)
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Judy M. Iriye in opposition to to Remand Case to #12 Decl. of Judy M. Iriye In Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Request To File Late-Received Declaration In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Sundar, Tina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Remand Case to State Court. The filer used the event, Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents > Memorandum in Support of Motion, which does not allow the filer to set the hearing date. For this one time only, clerk shall place this matter on calendar for the noticed date of 12/7/2018 at 9:30 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case To State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Iriye, Judy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Judy M. Iriye, #2 Declaration Angela Wagner, #3 Proposed Order)(Iriye, Judy)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continue the Scheduling Conference from November 9, 2018 to December 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.. (Iriye, Judy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Declaration of Janine R. Menhennet in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #3 Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #4 Certificate of Service re Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Menhennet, Janine) Modified on 11/19/2018 (gk).
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Janine R Menhennet on behalf of Plaintiff Shayna Amster (Attorney Janine R Menhennet added to party Shayna Amster(pty:pla))(Menhennet, Janine)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee on behalf of Plaintiff Shayna Amster (Attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee added to party Shayna Amster(pty:pla))(Mukherjee, Ruchira)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Plaintiff Shayna Amster (Attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio added to party Shayna Amster(pty:pla))(Rivapalacio, Victoria)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 09/27/2018. (Iriye, Judy)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
September 26, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. ((Filed in state court 9/26/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa)
September 26, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Filed in state court 9/25/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 6)(esa)
September 26, 2018 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 8/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
September 26, 2018 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Shayna Amster, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Amended Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
September 26, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Starbucks Corporation, filed by plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Filed in state court 9/17/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
September 26, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Starbucks Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Shayna Amster. (Filed in state court 7/10/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Iriye, Judy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Iriye, Judy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC713390 Receipt No: 0973-22487522 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachael S. Lavi, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Documents Served with Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Proof of Service for FAC, #6 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Answer to FAC, #8 Exhibit G - Initial Status Conference Order, #9 Exhibit H - Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action, #10 Exhibit I - Proof of Service re Complaint, #11 Declaration of Julie Broxson) (Attorney Judy M Iriye added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Iriye, Judy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shayna Amster v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayna Amster
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Represented By: Kyle R Nordrehaug
Represented By: Ruchira Piya Mukherjee
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Janine R Menhennet
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Jonathan M Lebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Judy M Iriye
Represented By: Keith A Jacoby
Represented By: Tina Sundar
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?