SBN V. FNBC, LLC, et al v. The Vessel Mr. Steven
Plaintiff: SBN V. FNBC, LLC
Defendant: The Vessel, Mr. Steven
Case Number: 2:2018cv08492
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0953
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) STAYING CASE DUE TO BANKRUPTCY #18 PETITION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Accordingly, this action against Defendant is hereby STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a). If they so desire, Plaintiffs may seek relief from the automatic stay with the Bankruptcy Court in accordance with 11 U.S.C. 362(d). The above matter is administratively closed pending further order of the Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher P Perque on behalf of Defendant The Vessel, Mr. Steven (Attorney Christopher P Perque added to party The Vessel, Mr. Steven(pty:dft))(Perque, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE Notice of Bankruptcy Stay filed by Defendant The Vessel, Mr. Steven. Notice of Automatic Stay (Perque, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08492 VAP(RAOx). (rn)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 WARRANT IN REM as to "MR. STEVEN" issued. (dml)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR ARREST by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #5 , Warrant for Seizure Request #6 (dml)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #5 APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel; granting #5 APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. (dml)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Vessel, Mr. Steven. (jtil)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN re: APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #5 , APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. Declaration of Don Beaumont in Support of Application for Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Arrest and Take Possession of Vessel and for Order for Substitute Custodian #9 , APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel Declaration of Mark Kilcoin in Support of Application for Order Directing US Marshal to Arrest and Take Possession of Vessel and for Order for Substitute Custodian APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. #7 (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR ARREST OF VESSEL re: APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #5 , APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel Declaration of Mark Kilcoin in Support of Application for Order Directing US Marshal to Arrest and Take Possession of Vessel and for Order for Substitute Custodian APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. #7 (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 [APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc.] Declaration of Don Beaumont in Support of Application for Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Arrest and Take Possession of Vessel and for Order for Substitute Custodian filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC. (Shuck, Thomas) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dml).
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 [APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel] Declaration of Mark Kilcoin in Support of Application for Order Directing US Marshal to Arrest and Take Possession of Vessel and for Order for Substitute Custodian, APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Nielsen Beaumont Marine, Inc. filed by plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Shuck, Thomas) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dml).
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #5 filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel , APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank, (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Shuck, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22518530 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank. (Attorney Thomas E Shuck added to party SBN V. FNBC, LLC, successor to FDIC as Receiver for First NBC Bank(pty:bkmov))(Shuck, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBN V. FNBC, LLC, et al v. The Vessel Mr. Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel, Mr. Steven
Represented By: Christopher P Perque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBN V. FNBC, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E Shuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?