Sheryl Tyson v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Sheryl Tyson
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv08834
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"), Connecticut General Corporation, Cigna Holdings,, Inc., Cigna Corporation. (Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Chineduh, Charles)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 12/7/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Chineduh, Charles)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro of C.T. Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (ghap)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Bather, Phillip)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Bather, Phillip)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sheryl Tyson, (Bather, Phillip)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22571588 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Tyson. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Sheryl Tyson(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheryl Tyson v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Tyson
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?