Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. v. Binhai Harbor Group HK Co. Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd. and Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.
Defendant: New Best Industrial Co. Ltd., Qingwu Liu, Desarollo Minero Unificado De Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Binhai Bulk Co. Ltd., Tianjin Binhai Harbor Port Group Co. and Binhai Harbor Group HK Co. Ltd.
Garnishee: Zhangjiagang Lianguan Recycling Science Technology Co. Ltd., Binhai Harbor Group (USA) Inc., Binhai Harbor Green Tech Inc. and Aspen Global Trading Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08909
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (Ex Parte) issued. (see attached) (hr)
November 8, 2018 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENTAL PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT issued. (see attached) (hr)
November 7, 2018 Filing 42 Supplemental Writ of Attachment filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. re: Order on Motion for Order,,, #22 (Black, Peter)
November 7, 2018 Filing 41 Supplemental Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. (Black, Peter)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Luke F. Zadkovich APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff PHOENIX BULK CARRIERS (BVI) LTD., designating Peter F. Black as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Floyd APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff PHOENIX BULK CARRIERS (BVI) LTD., designating Peter F. Black as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Binhai Bulk Co. Ltd. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Binhai Harbor Group HK Co. Ltd. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Tianjin Binhai Harbor Port Group Co. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Qingwu Liu. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 34 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Desarollo Minero Unificado De Mexico S.A. DE C.V.. (mrgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant New Best Industrial Co. Ltd. (mrgo)
October 24, 2018 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Luke F. Zadkovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22626361) filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Black, Peter)
October 23, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Floyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22626271) filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Black, Peter)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (Ex Parte) issued. (see attached) (hr)
October 18, 2018 Filing 23 PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT issued. (see attached) (hr)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT #10 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: NOW, upon motion of the Plaintiff, it is hereby: ORDERED, that pursuant to Rule B of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims, the Clerk of the Court shall issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment against all goods, chattels, credits, property, equipment, guarantees, ownership interests, letters of credit, bills of lading, effects, debts, claims, judgments and monies, electronic fund transfers, freights, sub-freights, charter hire, sub-charter hire, tangible or intangible, or any other funds or property of any nature whatsoever held by any garnishee within the District which are due and owing to the Defendants up to the amount of US$2,800,000.00 (see order for further details).
October 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order #20 . This order was docketed to the wrong case and belongs to 2:18cv8908. (mrgo)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Floyd. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Luke F. Zadkovich. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment #10 , Miscellaneous Document #11 (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE For Request for Review in Accordance with Supplemental Rule B and Local Admiralty Rule E.4(e) filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 Writ of Attachment filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd. re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment #10 (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd., (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Black, Peter)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22581694 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P, #2 Exhibit Q-HH, #3 Declaration) (Attorney Peter Fischer Black added to party Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.(pty:pla))(Black, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd. v. Binhai Harbor Group HK Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Best Industrial Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingwu Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desarollo Minero Unificado De Mexico S.A. DE C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binhai Bulk Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Binhai Harbor Port Group Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binhai Harbor Group HK Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Bulk Carriers (BVI) Ltd.
Represented By: Peter Fischer Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Bulk Carriers BVI Ltd.
Represented By: Luke Francis Zadkovich
Represented By: Erich P Wise
Represented By: Peter Fischer Black
Represented By: Edward William Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Zhangjiagang Lianguan Recycling Science Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Binhai Harbor Group (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Binhai Harbor Green Tech Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Aspen Global Trading Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?