Liggins v. GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant et al
Plaintiff: Adrienne Liggins
Defendant: Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, and Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach, Olive Garden, LLC, Olive Garden Italian Restaurant- Manhattan Beach, Olive Garden Holdings LLC, Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach, Does 1 through 50, inclusive and GMRI, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv09000
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration (Dkt. #12 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #12 set for Monday, December 10, 2018 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Jimenez, Carlos)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC. (Jimenez, Carlos)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Plaintiff Adrienne Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Suh, Roy)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Plaintiff Adrienne Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roy K. Suh in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Pending Action, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Adrienne Liggins in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Pending Action)(Suh, Roy)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ISO Defts Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Pending Action, #2 Declaration of Carlos Jimenez, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez, #5 Declaration of Melissa Ingalsbe, #6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Melissa Ingalsbe, #7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Melissa Ingalsbe, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defts Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Pending Action) (Chen, Peiyi)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #9 served on October 22, 2018. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Justin L. Quackenbush, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:12-cv-00715 JLQ(SPx) (rn)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC, re Notice of Related Case(s), #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,, #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 served on October 19, 2018. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jp)
October 18, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/17/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 5 OF EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
October 18, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Adrienne Liggins against Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., Does, GMRI, Inc, Olive Garden Holdings LLC, Olive Garden Italian Restaurant- Manhattan Beach, Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach, Olive Garden, LLC. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/22/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company identifying Defendant Olive Garden Holdings, LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant GMRI, Inc. Defendant GMRI, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Darden Restaurants, Inc. ( "Darden"). Defendant Darden is a publicly traded corporation. It does not have a parent corporation and no public corporation owns 10% or more of Darden stock. as Corporate Parent. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, identifying (1) Plaintiff Adrienne Liggins (2) Defendant GMRI, Inc. (3) Defendant Olive Garden Holdings, LLC (4) Defendant Darden Restaurant, Inc. (5) Defendant Olive Garden, LLC (6) Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Manhattan Beach and (7) Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC717321 Receipt No: 0973-22604148 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service on GMRI, #3 Exhibit C-Proof of Service on Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, #4 Exhibit D-Proof of Service on Darden Restaurant, Inc., #5 Exhibit E-Answer to Complaint, #6 Declaration of Randolph Babitt in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #7 Declaration of Colleen H. Lyons in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court) (Attorney Carlos Jimenez added to party Darden Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Jimenez added to party GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Jimenez added to party Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company(pty:dft))(Jimenez, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Garden Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Julie A Dunne
Represented By: Peiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMRI, INC., a Florida corporation doing business as Olive Garaden Italian Restaurant
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Garden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Garden Italian Restaurant- Manhattan Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Garden Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Julie A Dunne
Represented By: Peiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Garden Italian Restaurant-Huntington Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMRI, Inc
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Julie A Dunne
Represented By: Peiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Liggins
Represented By: Roy Karngwon Suh
Represented By: Joshua D Boxer
Represented By: Matthew John Matern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?