Jenkins v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr. and Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 2:2018cv09026
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Return to Habeas Petition (2254) #5 (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1, #2 Exh. 2, #3 Exh. 3, #4 Exh. 4, #5 Exh. 5, #6 Exh. 6, #7 Exh. 7)(Cano, Jennifer)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent On Habeas Corpus.(Cano, Jennifer)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Jennifer O. Cano on behalf of Respondent On Habeas Corpus. (Attorney Jennifer Ora Cano added to party On Habeas Corpus(pty:res))(Cano, Jennifer)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS ORDERED that: Within 14 days, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. (see order for further details). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition Part 1, #2 Petition Part 2, #3 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan H. Segal,(Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 part 2) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Jennifer Ora Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?