Austin Dickey v. Ticketmaster LLC et al

Plaintiff: Austin Dickey
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09052
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Gail J Standish
1 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Timothy L. O'Mara in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #20 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Mara, Timothy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Shawn Moon in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #20 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (O'Mara, Timothy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Kimberly Tobias in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #20 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(O'Mara, Timothy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/21/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (O'Mara, Timothy)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. #18 Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The Court orders as follows: Defendants shall file their motion to compel arbitration on or before December 14, 2018. Plaintiff shall file any opposition on or before January 18, 2019, (See order for further details) (yl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Mara, Timothy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 12/14/2018; Ticketmaster LLC answer now due 12/14/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.; Ticketmaster LLC.(O'Mara, Timothy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (O'Mara, Timothy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC, identifying Liberty Media Corporation. (O'Mara, Timothy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy L O'Mara on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Timothy L O'Mara added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy L O'Mara added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(O'Mara, Timothy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel M Wall on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Daniel M Wall added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Wall added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(Wall, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Austin Dickey, upon Defendant Ticketmaster LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarah Clemens, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Straus, Alex)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Austin Dickey, upon Defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarah Clemens, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Straus, Alex)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (mrgo)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Austin Dickey. (Straus, Alex)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Austin Dickey, (Straus, Alex)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed under a separate event, not as an attachment to the complaint. Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. (jtil)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ticketmaster LLC. (jtil)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Austin Dickey. (Straus, Alex)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22613661 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit CLRA Affidavit) (Attorney Alex R Straus added to party Austin Dickey(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Dickey v. Ticketmaster LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Represented By: Timothy L O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Represented By: Timothy L O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Dickey
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?