Chris Bridges v. Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Bridges
Defendant: TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION #495, NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation, Northwest Administrators, Inc. and Teamsters Local Union No. 495
Case Number: 2:2018cv09141
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to per Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sackman, J)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Order #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on October 26, 2018. (Sackman, J)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Natalia N Bautista on behalf of Defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc. (Bautista, Natalia)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Notice of Removal filed by defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc.. (Sackman, J)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J David Sackman counsel for Defendant NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation. Adding J. David Sackman as counsel of record for Defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Northwest Administrators, Inc.. (Attorney J David Sackman added to party NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft))(Sackman, J)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Chandna, Neelam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation. (Chandna, Neelam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2018-01020800-SC-SC-HNB Receipt No: 0973-22635560 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Neelam Chandna added to party NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft))(Chandna, Neelam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Bridges v. Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION #495
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Neelam Chandna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Neelam Chandna
Represented By: J David Sackman
Represented By: Natalia N Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No. 495
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?