Idea Factory Labs Limited v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Idea Factory Labs Limited
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09145
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 DEMURER, MOTION TO RE-ASSIGN PLAINTIFF AND PETITION TO CONTINUE IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION Plaintiff Idea Factory Labs Limited. (bp)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILING TO PAY FILING FEE AND FAILING TO RETAIN COUNSEL (DKT. #6 , #7 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Plaintiff has not complied with any of the requirements of the prior orders, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Puaperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed.. (bp)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF by Judge John A. Kronstadt:This case was filed on October 24, 2018. Dkt. 1. The Complaint identifies the Plaintiff as Idea Factory Labs Limited (the "IFL"). IFL is a company and, therefore, cannot represent itself in a civil proceedings. The Court will permit IFL the opportunity to retain counsel. On or before December 3, 2018, IFL shall designate counsel who shall then file the appropriate application to appear on the behalf of IFL. If IFL has not retained counsel by that date, the action will be dismissed without prejudice. (bp)
October 29, 2018 Re APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Plaintiff Idea Factory Labs Limited. (lh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Idea Factory Labs Limited. (lh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Apple Inc. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Filed by Plaintiff Idea Factory Labs Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idea Factory Labs Limited v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idea Factory Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?