WB Music Corp., et al v. Solitaire Holdings, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Baby Spike Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. and Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: Long Kim Huot and Solitaire Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09450
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music, upon Defendant Solitaire Holdings, LLC served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rey Ortega, Day Shift Manager, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9450 MWF (AFMx). (esa) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/3/2018) (esa).
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other), #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Documents No.5. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendants Long Kim Huot, Solitaire Holdings, LLC. (lh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Cassandra E. Havens re Summons Request, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA E. HAVENS REGARDING JOINDER OF MULTIPLE COPYRIGHT CLAIMS filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Baby Spike Music, Herbilicious Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, North Avenue Music, Pure Love Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., WB Music Corp., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22707712 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Naughty Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., North Avenue Music, Herbilicious Music, Baby Spike Music, Neutral Gray Music, WB Music Corp., Pure Love Music. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Baby Spike Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Herbilicious Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Naughty Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Neutral Gray Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party North Avenue Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Pure Love Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Havens, Cassandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp., et al v. Solitaire Holdings, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Kim Huot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solitaire Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baby Spike Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Avenue Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Love Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbilicious Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naughty Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neutral Gray Music
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wut Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?