Tarpo Music Publishing et al v. 6506 Hollywood Associates LP et al

Plaintiff: Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing and Trill Productions
Defendant: Robert Vinokur, Fox Theatre Group, L.L.C., Elie Kheir Samaha and 6506 Hollywood Associates LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv09451
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: S James Otero
1 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant 6506 Hollywood Associates LP filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cassandra E. Havens in Support of Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant 6506 Hollywood Associates LP, #2 Proof of Service) (Mayo, Sharon)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero previously scheduled for 1/4/19 has been rescheduled. The Court continues the Order to Show Cause to 1/8/2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions, upon Defendant Fox Theatre Group, L.L.C. served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Vinokur, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions, upon Defendant Robert Vinokur served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Vinokur in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions, upon Defendant Elie Kheir Samaha served on 12/16/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elie Kheir Samaha in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later then January 4, 2019 why his action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Answer by the Defendant(s) or Plaintiff's request for entry of default. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proof of Service of Summons)(Mayo, Sharon)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) #12 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 12/27/18 BY 4:00 PM. (lc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Errata. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Vinokur, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons)(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 12/27/2018 (lc). (STRICKEN PER COURTS 12/27/18 G112B RESPONSE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions, upon Defendant 6506 Hollywood Associates LP served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayo, Sharon)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants 6506 Hollywood Associates LP, Fox Theatre Group, L.L.C., Elie Kheir Samaha and Robert Vinokur. (jtil)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Cassandra E. Havens re Summons Request #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 Declaration of Cassandra E. Havens Regarding Joinder of Multiple Copyright Claims filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Havens, Cassandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22708850 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Mouse on Tha Track, LLC, Notting Dale Songs, Tarpo Music Publishing, Trill Productions. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Mouse on Tha Track, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Notting Dale Songs(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Tarpo Music Publishing(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Trill Productions(pty:pla))(Havens, Cassandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarpo Music Publishing et al v. 6506 Hollywood Associates LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mouse on Tha Track, LLC
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Notting Dale Songs
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarpo Music Publishing
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trill Productions
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vinokur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Theatre Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Kheir Samaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6506 Hollywood Associates LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?