Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv09478
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Re Stipulation and Request to Set Aside Default and Extend Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Deadline to File an Answer to the complaint #13 by Judge Dale S. Fischer that the default against Defendant Starbucks Corporation #12 be set aside, and that Defendant may file Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order. (jp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Starbucks Corporation filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 **THIS DOCUMENT IS HEREBY SET ASIDE, PER ORDER #14 *** DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Starbucks Corporation, a Washington Corporation (bp). Modified on 12/26/2018 (jp).
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Starbucks Corporation filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George- Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (et)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey, (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22712957 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Dwain Lammey(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?