Ashwin Mehta v. Autobank General Auto Group

Plaintiff: Ashwin Mehta
Defendant: Autobank General Auto Group d/b/a Citi Rental Cars and Autobank General Auto Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv09562
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashwin Mehta, upon Defendant Autobank General Auto Group served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Oscar Ramirez, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wagner, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Autobank General Auto Group. (jtil)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ashwin Mehta. (Loker, Matthew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ashwin Mehta, (Loker, Matthew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ashwin Mehta. (Loker, Matthew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22728422 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ashwin Mehta. (Attorney Matthew M Loker added to party Ashwin Mehta(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashwin Mehta v. Autobank General Auto Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashwin Mehta
Represented By: Matthew M Loker
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Wagner
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autobank General Auto Group d/b/a Citi Rental Cars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autobank General Auto Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?