Rachel King v. Wal Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rachel King
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09613
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
1 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Raena W. Ohiri , Esq. In Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Bryan C. Zaverl In Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Rachel King. (Zaverl, Bryan)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF RA'CHEL KING'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT [filed 12/11/18; Docket No. #12 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. (iv)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel for both parties are ordered to show cause in writing by January 14, 2019 why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $1,500.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the imposition of sanctions. (iv)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 OPPOSITION To Plainitiff's Motion to Remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration to RWO)(Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by PLAINTIFF RA'CHEL KING Rachel King. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed ORDER in PDF) (Zaverl, Bryan)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/24/2019 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on December 17, 2018 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 6, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: May 10, 2019. (iv)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc... (Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for December 17, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before December 5, 2018. (iv)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
November 14, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/13/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
November 14, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, inclusive, Wal Mart Stores, Inc., filed by plaintiff Rachel King. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/14/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc., (Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC698328 Receipt No: 0973-22743844 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wal Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Declaration of RWO) (Attorney Raena Elizabeth Walker Ohiri added to party Wal Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ohiri, Raena Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel King v. Wal Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Raena Elizabeth Walker Ohiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Raena Elizabeth Walker Ohiri
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel King
Represented By: Siamak Vaziri
Represented By: Bryan Corey Zaverl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?