Wolfgang Puck et al v. W.P. Productions, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck and Sydney Silverman
Respondent: W.P. Productions, Inc. and W.P. Appliances, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09708
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #8 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Upon review of the parties' January 18, 2019 Joint Report, the Court sets a hearing on the Scheduling Conference for March 11, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will set dates, if necessary, after the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand. Dkt. #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 0 Days, filed by Petitioners Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Award, #2 Exhibit Judgment, #3 Exhibit Amended Judgment)(Barchie, Gregory)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Petitioners Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck. (Barchie, Gregory)
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Respondents W.P. Appliances, Inc., W.P. Productions, Inc., identifying Wolfgang Puck, Barbara Lazaroff, W.P. Productions, Inc., W.P. Appliances, Inc., and Sydney Silverman. (Baker, Matthew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 and Request for Attorney's Fees filed by Respondents W.P. Appliances, Inc., W.P. Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew F Baker added to party W.P. Appliances, Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Matthew F Baker added to party W.P. Productions, Inc.(pty:res))(Baker, Matthew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 and Request for Attorneys' Fees; Cross-Request for Attorneys' Fees filed by Movant Sydney Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth M. Treckler in Support of Sydney Silverman's Opposition to Motion for Remand and Request for Attorneys' Fees)(Treckler, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Movant Sydney Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part I, #2 Exhibit A, Part II, #3 Exhibit A, Part III, #4 Exhibit A, Part IV, #5 Exhibit A, Part V, #6 Exhibit A, Part VI)(Matthias, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioners Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck, identifying Wolfgang Puck Worldwide, Inc.. (Barchie, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Petitioners Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gregory P. Barchie in Support of Petitioners' Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand to State Court, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K) (Barchie, Gregory)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Gregory Paul Barchie counsel for Petitioners Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck. Changing firm name to Sauer & Wagner. Changing e-mail to gbarchie@swattys.com. Filed by Petitioners Wolfgang Puck and Barbara Lazaroff. (Barchie, Gregory)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. NO HEARING: UNDER SUBMISSION. Joint Report due 1/18/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Specially Appearing Party Sydney Silverman, served on 11/19/2018. (Treckler, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
November 16, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD filed against Barbara Lazaroff, Wolfgang Puck, W.P. Appliances, Inc., W.P. Productions, Inc., filed by Movant Specially Appearing Party Sydney Silverman. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/5/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Party Sydney Silverman, identifying Wolfgang Puck, Petitioner; Barbara Lazaroff, Petitioner; W.P. Productions, Inc., Respondent; W.P. Appliances, Inc., Respondent. (Treckler, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Miscellaneous Sydney Silverman. (Treckler, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BS173923 Receipt No: 0973-22760365 - Fee: $400, filed by Specially Appearing Party Sydney Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Elizabeth M Treckler added to party Sydney Silverman(pty:misc))(Treckler, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfgang Puck et al v. W.P. Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.P. Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Matthew F Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W.P. Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Matthew F Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barbara Lazaroff
Represented By: Gregory Paul Barchie
Represented By: Robert Steven Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wolfgang Puck
Represented By: Gregory Paul Barchie
Represented By: Robert Steven Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sydney Silverman
Represented By: Michael R Matthias
Represented By: Elizabeth M Treckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?