UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. iBus Media Limited et al

Plaintiff: Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corp., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC and Universal Music Z Tunes LLC
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, iBus Media Limited and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv09709
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0106
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Polygram Publishing, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal Music, Inc., upon Defendant iBus Media Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Lee, Receptionist. (Wais, Aaron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 ) mailed to iBus Media Limited, 33-37 Athol Street, Douglas Isle of Man IM IM1 1LB on 12/13/18 (lc)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant iBus Media Limited. (jtil)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., identifying Plaintiffs UMG Recordings, Inc.; Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC; Capitol Records, LLC; Universal Music Corp.; Songs of Universal, Inc.; PolyGram Publishing, Inc.; Universal Music MGB NA LLC; Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, and Vivendi, S.A., the ultimate parent company of Plaintiffs; Defendant iBus Media Limited. (Wais, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Songs of Universal Music, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp.. (Wais, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22760494 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Polygram Publishing, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC, Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal Music, Inc.. (Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Polygram Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Songs of Universal Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron Michael Wais added to party Universal Music Corp.(pty:pla))(Wais, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. iBus Media Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music -- MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Music, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polygram Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music -- Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Aaron Michael Wais
Represented By: Bradley J Mullins
Represented By: David A Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iBus Media Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?