Deol Transport, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW et al
Plaintiff: Deol Transport, Inc.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Lloyd's Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW
Case Number: 2:2018cv09754
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY Brief in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Stay or Transfer #10 filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW. (Larson, John)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT LLOYD'S, LONDON, LLOYD'SPOLICY NO. Z178324-005APD- 16200-GIW TO DISMISS, STAY, OR TRANSFER THE INSTANTACTION #13 by Judge S. James Otero: The hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Instant Action from is continued from January 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., to February 4, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. #10 . Plaintiffs opposing papers are due to be filed and served not less than 21 calendar days prior to the continued hearing date. Defendants reply papers are due to be filed not less than 14 calendar days prior to the date of the continued hearing of February 4, 2019. (lc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Stay or Transfer #10 filed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Shewry, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Declaration, #18 Certificate of Service)(Shewry, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Continue Defendant Lloyd's, London, Lloyd's Policy No. Z178324-005apd-16200-Giw To Dismiss, Stay, Or Transfer The Instant Action from January 28, 2019 to February 4, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Stay or Transfer #10 filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW, (Attorney John Bradley Larson added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW(pty:dft))(Larson, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Stay or Transfer #10 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Stay or Transfer filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John Bradley Larson added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW(pty:dft)) (Larson, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc., upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Calvano - Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shewry, Steven)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW. (ghap)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc.. (Shewry, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc., identifying Deol Transport, Inc, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Shewry, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc.. (Shewry, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22770770 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deol Transport, Inc.. (Attorney Steven M Shewry added to party Deol Transport, Inc.(pty:pla))(Shewry, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deol Transport, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deol Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Shewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Lloyd's Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lloyds Policy No. Z178324-005APD-16200-GIW
Represented By: John Bradley Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?