Tanya Davis v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Tanya Davis
Defendant: Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv09772
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Notice (Other) #3 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The name of Defendants HENRIETTA MCGUFFIE and THELMA JOHNSON shall be deleted from the caption of this case; 2. The United States of America shall be inserted in the caption in place and instead of HENRIETTA MCGUFFIE and THELMA JOHNSON 3. The Caption shall be changed as follows: TANYA DAVIS, Plaintiff, v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Defendant. (mrgo)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Because Plaintiff has failed to file a timely opposition, Defendants' motion to dismiss #6 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 21 days of this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Conny Beatty #6 filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Blau, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending DUE TO THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS #8 served on DECEMBER 26, 2018. (Blau, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending DUE TO THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blau, Daniel)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Conny Beatty filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Blau, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 POS)(Blau, Daniel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. (Blau, Daniel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 18SMSC03236 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendants Thelma Johnson, Henrietta McGuffie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Daniel Oren Blau added to party Thelma Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Oren Blau added to party Henrietta McGuffie(pty:dft))(Blau, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanya Davis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Oren Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrietta McGuffie
Represented By: Daniel Oren Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Oren Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?