Waddell and Reed, Inc. v. William Ferrell Albin
Plaintiff: Waddell & Reed, Inc.
Defendant: Willilam Ferrell Albin
Petitioner: Waddell and Reed, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09777
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent Willilam Ferrell Albin, (Park, Young)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Respondent Willilam Ferrell Albin.(Attorney Young Kook Park added to party Willilam Ferrell Albin(pty:res))(Park, Young)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-09777 PSG(Ex). (rn)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The proof of Service docket entry indicates that service is executed under SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D. This is incorrect since service is not made by the Court) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Waddell and Reed, Inc., upon Defendant Willilam Ferrell Albin served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Waddell and Reed, Inc.. (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent Willilam Ferrell Albin. (et)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Waddell & Reed, Inc., identifying Plaintff Waddell & Reed, Inc., and Defendant William Ferrell Albin. (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kazim A. Naqvi re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 -- Declaration of Kazim A. Naqvi in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Plaintiff Waddell & Reed, Inc.. (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING filed -- Notice of Lodgment in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Petitioner Waddell & Reed, Inc.. (Naqvi, Kazim)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award; Request for Entry of Judgment Receipt No: 0973-22775447 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Waddell & Reed, Inc.. (Attorney Kazim A Naqvi added to party Waddell & Reed, Inc.(pty:pla))(Naqvi, Kazim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waddell and Reed, Inc. v. William Ferrell Albin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waddell & Reed, Inc.
Represented By: Kazim A Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willilam Ferrell Albin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Waddell and Reed, Inc.
Represented By: Kazim A Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?