Douglas Jacobsen et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Monique Jacobsen and Douglas Jacobsen
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Co. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv09819
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION #14 EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court extends Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 25, 2019. (iv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 25, 2019 re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rackers, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy M Lee counsel for Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen. Nancy M. Lee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen and Monique Jacobsen. (Lee, Nancy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Charles Sandler counsel for Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen. Adding Jonathan C. Sandler as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen and Monique Jacobsen for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen and Monique Jacobsen. (Attorney Jonathan Charles Sandler added to party Douglas Jacobsen(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Charles Sandler added to party Monique Jacobsen(pty:pla))(Sandler, Jonathan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer now due 12/27/2018; Wells Fargo & Co. answer now due 12/27/2018, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Wells Fargo & Co..(Rackers, Mark)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen.. (Lee, Nancy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank and Co.. (Lee, Nancy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen, (Lee, Nancy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer now due 12/13/2018; Wells Fargo Bank and Co. answer now due 12/13/2018, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Wells Fargo Bank and Co..(Rackers, Mark)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
November 21, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen, upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank and Co. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/30/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
November 21, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen, upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/30/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
November 21, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank and Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Does 1-20. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Jacobsen, Monique Jacobsen. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/23/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (Vogel, Edward)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Vogel, Edward)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STCV01879 Receipt No: 0973-22782047 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Remaining State Court File, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Edward D Vogel added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Edward D Vogel added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Vogel, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Jacobsen et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Jacobsen
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Sandler
Represented By: Nancy M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Jacobsen
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Sandler
Represented By: Nancy M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: John C Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: John C Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?