Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A. et al v. Howard Nagelberg

Plaintiff: Crystal Debussy Limited, Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A. and Crystal Cruises, LLC
Defendant: Howard Nagelberg
Case Number: 2:2018cv10004
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #7 as to Defendant Howard Nagelberg. (dml)
January 9, 2019 11 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Movant Crystal Cruises, LLC, Plaintiff Crystal Debussy Limited. EXHIBIT A as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #7 . (Peacock, Albert)
January 9, 2019 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #7 filed by Plaintiff Crystal Cruises, LLC, Crystal Debussy Limited. (Peacock, Albert)
January 9, 2019 9 AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crystal Cruises, LLC, Crystal Debussy Limited, identifying Crystal Acquisition Company Limited. (Peacock, Albert)
January 9, 2019 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Plaintiff Crystal Debussy Limited identifying Crystal Acquisition Company Limited as Corporate Parent. (Peacock, Albert)
January 9, 2019 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Crystal Cruises, LLC, Crystal Debussy Limited amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Crystal Cruises, LLC, Crystal Debussy Limited(Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Crystal Cruises, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Crystal Debussy Limited(pty:bkmov))(Peacock, Albert)
December 20, 2018 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Howard Nagelberg. (hr)
December 3, 2018 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
November 29, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Debussy Limited, Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A. identifying Crystal Acquisition Company Limited,Crystal Intermediate Holdings Limited, Crystal Luxury Corporation Limited (Bermuda), Ocean World Limited (Bermuda), Genting Hong Kong Limited. as Corporate Parent. (Peacock, Albert)
November 29, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crystal Debussy Limited, Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A., identifying Crystal Acquisition Company Limited,Crystal Intermediate Holdings Limited, Crystal Luxury Corporation Limited (Bermuda), Ocean World Limited (Bermuda), Genting Hong Kong Limited. (Peacock, Albert)
November 29, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Debussy Limited, Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A.. (Peacock, Albert)
November 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22820957 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A., Crystal Debussy Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Crystal Debussy Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A.(pty:pla))(Peacock, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A. et al v. Howard Nagelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Debussy Limited
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: Samantha W Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal River Cruises Operations Cooperatief U.A.
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Cruises, LLC
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: Samantha W Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Nagelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?