Kenneth Wayne Lewis v. Mens Colony

Petitioner: Kenneth Wayne Lewis
Respondent: Mens Colony
Case Number: 2:2018cv10007
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner Kenneth Wayne Lewis. (clee)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The Court is in receipt of Petitioners Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees. (ECF No. #4 ). The request is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Kenneth Wayne Lewis. (hr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim.THEREFORE, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before January 7, 2019 why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction, failure to exhaust, and untimeliness. If Petitioner no longer wishes to pursue this action, he may voluntarily dismiss the action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by filing a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to provide Petitioner with a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Form CV009. If Petitioner does not file a notice of voluntary dismissal or timely response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court may also recommend involuntary dismissal of the Petition for failure to prosecute and/or obey court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P 41(b) L.R. 41-1. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal CV-009) (clee)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice of Discrepancies for filing of Habeas Corpus Petition and CV60p) (et)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Kenneth Wayne Lewis. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Wayne Lewis v. Mens Colony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mens Colony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Wayne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?