Richard Loope v. Comenity Bank

Plaintiff: Richard Loope
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv10111
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Richard Loope. (Hammoud, Youssef)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Generally, defendant must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States). In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before February 11, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Comenity Bank answer now due 1/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Comenity Bank.(Kaminski, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Loope, upon Defendant Comenity Bank served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Operations Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hammoud, Youssef)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Comenity Bank answer now due 1/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Comenity Bank.(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Comenity Bank(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Comenity Bank. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Richard Loope, (Rodkey, Lauren)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Loope. (Rodkey, Lauren)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard Loope. (Rodkey, Lauren)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22845894 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Richard Loope. (Attorney Lauren Tegan Rodkey added to party Richard Loope(pty:pla))(Rodkey, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Loope v. Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Stephen A Watkins
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Loope
Represented By: Lauren Tegan Rodkey
Represented By: Youssef Hussein Hammoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?