Jeffrey Rudin v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rudin
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv10120
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Ventura County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Ventura County Superior Court. (mrgo)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Ventura County Superior Court, Case number 56-2018-00519275-CU-BCVTA. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-10120 PA(Ex). (rn)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
December 5, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/03/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
December 5, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Rudin. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/26/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on 12/5/18. (Fonseca, Freddy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Fonseca, Freddy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, identifying Tata Motors Limited. (Fonseca, Freddy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura, case number 56-2018-00519275 Receipt No: 0973-22847206 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit "C" - Repair Order) (Attorney Freddy Israel Fonseca added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Fonseca, Freddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Rudin v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Freddy Israel Fonseca
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rudin
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?