Star Fabrics, Inc. v. Sadie and Sage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, Sadie & Sage, Inc., Lillyful, Myung S. Park, Unit Fashion, Inc., Daisy Shoppe and Sadie and Sage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10122
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Daisy Shoppe, Unit Fashion, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #6 as to Defendants Daisy Shoppe, Lillyful, Myung S. Park, Sadie and Sage, Inc., Unit Fashion, Inc.. (bp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #6 as to Defendants Daisy Shoppe, Lillyful, Myung S. Park, Sadie and Sage, Inc., Unit Fashion, Inc. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #6 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES 1 through 10, Lillyful, Myung S. Park, Sadie & Sage, Inc., Daisy Shoppe, Unit Fashion, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.(Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Star Fabrics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22847385 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Star Fabrics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star Fabrics, Inc. v. Sadie and Sage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie & Sage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillyful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myung S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Shoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie and Sage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Jessica Laine Phillips
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?