Star Fabrics, Inc. v. Tazga et al
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, Style Ventures, LLC, Alice in Wonderland Frocks, Inc., Audrey 3+1, Tazga, Planet Gold Clothing Co., Inc. and Global Gold, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10125
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (clee)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #6 as to Defendants Alice in Wonderland Frocks, Inc., Audrey 31, Global Gold, Inc., Planet Gold Clothing Co., Inc., Tazga. (car)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #6 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Alice in Wonderland Frocks, Inc., Audrey 31, DOES 1 through 10, Tazga, Planet Gold Clothing Co., Inc., Global Gold, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.(Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22847491 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Star Fabrics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star Fabrics, Inc. v. Tazga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Style Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice in Wonderland Frocks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey 3+1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tazga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Gold Clothing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Gold, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Fabrics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Jessica Laine Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?