Robert Borquez et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kristy Borquez and Robert Borquez
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Contents Solutions, Inc. and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv10165
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Sveslosky, Scott)
January 15, 2019 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez, re Amended Complaint/Petition #14 served on First Amended Complaint Served on Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Grossman, Evangeline)
January 15, 2019 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.(Sveslosky, Scott)
January 14, 2019 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grossman, Evangeline)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES #12 , by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint, a copy of which is attached to the stipulation as 'Exhibit A' no later than January 15, 2019, so that it filed on the docket as its own docket entry. On or before January 17, 2019, Defendants shall file their answer to the First (bp)
January 8, 2019 12 STIPULATION to and Order Granting Leave To File First Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint)(Grossman, Evangeline)
January 7, 2019 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Contents Solutions, Inc.. (Grossman, Evangeline)
January 2, 2019 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, re Standing Orders for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt served on January 2, 2019. (Sveslosky, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (See document for specifics) (mrgo)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; NO HEARING: UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report Due: January 25, 2019. (mrgo)
December 10, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
December 6, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Filed in State Court on 6/29/18 Submitted with Exhibit B attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
December 6, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez, upon Defendant Allstate Insurance Company served on 6/1/2018, answer due 6/22/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz of C.T. Corporation - Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/18 Submitted with attachment 4 to document entitled Exhibit #2 (car)
December 6, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez, upon Defendant Contents Solutions, Inc. served on 6/1/2018, answer due 6/22/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Danielle Gaulden-Administrative Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/2018 Submitted with Exhibit C Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 12/10/2018 (car).
December 6, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Contents Solutions, Inc., Does 1 to 10, Inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Kristy Borquez, Robert Borquez. Filed in State Court on 5/17/18 Submitted with Exhibit A attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
December 6, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, identifying Allstate Insurance Company. (Sveslosky, Scott)
December 6, 2018 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Sveslosky, Scott)
December 6, 2018 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Exhibits E through G Filed Separately Due to Volume as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declarations of Sveslosky and Cisneros, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F - Notice and Motion re Trial Preference, #3 Exhibit Exhibig G - Declaration of Westphal)(Sveslosky, Scott)
December 6, 2018 2 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Exhibit D Files Separately Due to Volume as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Da - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Db - Civil Cover Sheet Addendum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Dc - Notice of Case Mgt Conf, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Dd - Proof of Service re Deft. Allstate, #5 Exhibit Exhibit De- Proof of Service re Deft. Contents Solutions, #6 Exhibit Exhibit DfNotice & Motion re Peremptory Challenge, #7 Exhibit Exhibit Dg - Minute Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit Dh - Notice of Case Management Conf, #9 Exhibit Exhibit Di - Notice & Order Granting Peremptory Challenge, #10 Exhibit Exhibit Dj - Civil Deposit, #11 Exhibit Exhibit Dk - Application to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem, #12 Exhibit Exhibit Dl - Notice of Rejection re Application to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem, #13 Exhibit Exhibit Dm - Plaintiffs Case Management Statement, #14 Exhibit Exhibit Dn - Deft Allstate's Case Management Statement, #15 Exhibit Exhibit Do - Civil Deposit, #16 Exhibit Exhibit Dp - Minute Order, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Dq - Notice re Continuance of Case Managment Conference, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Dr - Minute Order, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Ds - Notice re Continuance of Case Management Conference)(Sveslosky, Scott)
December 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, case number BC706570 Receipt No: 0973-22855367 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service re Contents Solutions, Inc.) (Attorney Scott R Sveslosky added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sveslosky, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Borquez et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Borquez
Represented By: Evangeline F Grossman
Represented By: Tonna Kaye Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Borquez
Represented By: Evangeline F Grossman
Represented By: Tonna Kaye Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott R Sveslosky
Represented By: Peter H Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?