Swift Harvest USA, LLC v. Rite Aid Corporation

Plaintiff: Swift Harvest USA, LLC
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv10170
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bp)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION: NO HEARING by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report due 3/1/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from April 15, 2019 to April 29, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2019 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corporation. (Samuels, William)
January 25, 2019 16 DECLARATION of William R Samuels in support of defendant Rite Aid Corporation's Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Samuels, William)
January 25, 2019 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities) (Samuels, William)
January 25, 2019 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William Roberts Samuels on behalf of Defendant Rite Aid Corporation (Samuels, William)
January 10, 2019 13 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rite Aid Corporation answer now due 1/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corporation.(Attorney William Roberts Samuels added to party Rite Aid Corporation(pty:dft))(Samuels, William)
December 31, 2018 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 31, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, re Order #9 served on 12/28/2018. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 31, 2018 10 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, upon Defendant Rite Aid Corporation acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by CT CORPORATION, Agent for Service of Process. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (See document for specifics) (mrgo)
December 7, 2018 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rite Aid Corporation. (lh)
December 7, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 7, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
December 6, 2018 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, identifying OCCASIONS, LTD.. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22854968 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C) (Attorney Stephen L Raucher added to party Swift Harvest USA, LLC(pty:pla))(Raucher, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift Harvest USA, LLC v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Harvest USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L Raucher
Represented By: Hana S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: William Roberts Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?